William Warburton v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: William Warburton
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Holthouse Carlin & Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan and Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan
Case Number: 2:2021cv09884
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan.(Decker, Byrne)
February 11, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan answer now due 2/18/2022; Aetna Life Insurance Company answer now due 2/18/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan ; Aetna Life Insurance Company; Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Attorney Byrne J Decker added to party Aetna Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Byrne J Decker added to party Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan (pty:dft))(Decker, Byrne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Byrne J. Decker as Lead Counsel filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Decker, Byrne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, (Decker, Byrne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Decker, Byrne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Attorney Byrne J Decker added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Decker, Byrne)
December 30, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Warburton, upon Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
December 30, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Warburton, upon Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff William Warburton. (Bather, Phillip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff William Warburton. (Bather, Phillip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff William Warburton. (Bather, Phillip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff William Warburton. (Bather, Phillip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff William Warburton, (Bather, Phillip)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32525664 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff William Warburton. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party William Warburton(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Warburton v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Warburton
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holthouse Carlin & Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holthouse Carlin and Van Trigt LLP Welfare Plan
Represented By: Byrne J Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?