Ammad Omar et al v. U. S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Ammad Omar and National Public Radio, Inc.
Defendant: U. S. Department of Homeland Security and Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2021cv09928
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph William Tursi counsel for Defendants Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U. S. Department of Homeland Security. Adding Joseph W. Tursi as counsel of record for United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs enforcement for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs enforcement. (Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph William Tursi added to party U. S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Tursi, Joseph)
February 17, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Ammad Omar, National Public Radio, Inc., upon Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/31/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; U. S. Department of Homeland Security served on 1/31/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to illegible. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unnamed individual. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service)(Prather, Laura)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney William Reid Pillifant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar, designating Jason T. Lao as local counsel. (lom)
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reid W. Pillifant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/9/2022, Receipt No. 32761349) filed by Plaintiffs National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jason T. Lao added to party National Public Radio, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jason T. Lao added to party Ammad Omar(pty:pla)) (Lao, Jason)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #13 , Summons Request #12 . The following error(s) was found: The summons were previously issued on 12/27/2021, and have not been returned executed or unexecuted. Docket entry nos. 9 and 10 have been corrected to read, "60 day summons issued." (aco)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar. (Prather, Laura)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar. (Prather, Laura)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (iv)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (et) Modified on 1/27/2022 (aco).
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U. S. Department of Homeland Security. (et) Modified on 1/27/2022 (aco).
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Interested Parties re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Prather, Laura)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar. (Prather, Laura)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar. (Prather, Laura)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs National Public Radio, Inc., Ammad Omar (Prather, Laura)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32532427 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ammad Omar, National Public Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit B-GAO, #4 Exhibit C-FOIA Request, #5 Exhibit D-FOIA Request, #6 Exhibit E-FOIA Request) (Attorney Laura Lee Prather added to party National Public Radio, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Lee Prather added to party Ammad Omar(pty:pla))(Prather, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammad Omar et al v. U. S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ammad Omar
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Represented By: Jason T. Lao
Represented By: William Reid Pillifant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Public Radio, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Represented By: Jason T. Lao
Represented By: William Reid Pillifant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joseph William Tursi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Joseph William Tursi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?