Morgana Myvett v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Morgana Myvett
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv10002
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-10002 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Morgana Myvett, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/13/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Panutich, Alex)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Morgana Myvett. (Panutich, Alex)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. [See document for further details.] (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (et)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (et)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #5 . (et)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Morgana Myvett. (Panutich, Alex)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Morgana Myvett, (Panutich, Alex)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Morgana Myvett. (Panutich, Alex)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Morgana Myvett. (Panutich, Alex)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Morgana Myvett. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party Morgana Myvett(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgana Myvett v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgana Myvett
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Armand D Roth
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?