Snap Inc. v. Drew Hirshfeld et al
Plaintiff: Snap Inc.
Defendant: DREW HIRSHFELD, in his capacity as Acting Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office,, THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE,, Drew Hirshfeld and The United States Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 2:2022cv00085
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Snap Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 served on 1/11/22. (Bernstein, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Snap Inc., upon U.S. Attorney General Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged and name illegible). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged, but not signed). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged and name illegible). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Bernstein, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Snap Inc., upon U.S. Attorney for the Central District of California Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged and name illegible). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged, but not signed). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged and name illegible). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Bernstein, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Snap Inc., upon Defendant The United States Patent and Trademark Office served on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged and name illegible). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged, but not signed). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged and name illegible). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Bernstein, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Snap Inc., upon Defendant Drew Hirshfeld served on 1/14/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to "Officer Doe" (Receipt signed and illegible). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged, but not signed). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Officer Doe (Receipt Acknowledged, but not signed). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Bernstein, David)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The United States Patent and Trademark Office. (car)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 CORRECTED 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Drew Hirshfeld. (car)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The Summons #9 was erroneously issued as a 21 DAY summons. A corrected 60 DAY summons will be issued. Docket item 9 should be disregarded. (car)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 1/7/2022, SEE ITEM 10] 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Drew Hirshfeld. (car) Modified on 1/7/2022 (car).
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Snap Inc.. (Bernstein, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Snap Inc.. (Bernstein, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Snap Inc., identifying None. (Bernstein, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Snap Inc.. (Bernstein, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32573144 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Snap Inc.. (Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Snap Inc.(pty:pla))(Bernstein, David)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32573144 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Snap Inc.. (Attorney David Hal Bernstein added to party Snap Inc.(pty:pla))(Bernstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snap Inc. v. Drew Hirshfeld et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snap Inc.
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Jared I Kagan
Represented By: Parker C Eudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW HIRSHFELD, in his capacity as Acting Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Hirshfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?