Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz et al v. Little Libros LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz, Don Clemente, Inc. and Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V.
Defendant: Little Libros LLC, John and Jane DOE 1 through 10 and John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2022cv00138
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 filed by Plaintiffs Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz. (Noli, Mariana)
March 4, 2022 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 filed by Plaintiffs Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz. (Noli, Mariana)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiffs John and Jane Does, Little Libros LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz, Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Don Clemente, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Noli, Mariana)
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz, Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Don Clemente, Inc.. upon Little Libros LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Larry Zerner, Attorney for Defendant. (Noli, Mariana)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to defendant Little Libros LLC. (mrgo)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz, (Noli, Mariana)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #9 filed by Plaintiffs Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz. (Noli, Mariana)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz. (Noli, Mariana)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz. (Noli, Mariana)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Don Clemente, Inc., Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz. (Noli, Mariana)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32583235 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz, Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V., Don Clemente, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Attorney Mariana P Noli added to party Don Clemente, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Mariana P Noli added to party Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Mariana P Noli added to party Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz(pty:pla))(Noli, Mariana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz et al v. Little Libros LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Maria Sanchez Quiroz
Represented By: Mariana P Noli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Clemente, Inc.
Represented By: Mariana P Noli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasatiempos Gallo, S. A. de C.V.
Represented By: Mariana P Noli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Libros LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane DOE 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?