In Re Ethereummax Investor Litigation
Plaintiff: Ryan Huegerich, Christopher DeLuca, Neil Shah, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda and Michael Buckley
Defendant: Steve Gentile, Giovanni Perone, Justin French, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Paul Pierce, Defendant X, John Does 1-10, Mike Speer, Justin Maher, Russell Davis, Antonio Brown, Jona Rechnitz and EMAX Holdings, LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jonathan Semerjian, Nabil Nahlah, Till Freeman and Marko Ciklic
Case Number: 2:2022cv00163
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 201 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #190 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz.(Schafler, Michael)
November 21, 2023 Filing 200 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #190 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Paul Pierce.(Weiner, Joel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 199 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #190 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian.(Rhodes, Michael)
November 21, 2023 Filing 198 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #190 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr..(Sanders, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 197 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #190 filed by Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone.(Jewett, Bradley)
November 14, 2023 Filing 196 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradley E Jewett counsel for Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone. Adding Bradley E. Jewett as counsel of record for EMAX Holdings, LLC; Giovanni Perone for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC; Giovanni Perone. (Attorney Bradley E Jewett added to party EMAX Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley E Jewett added to party Giovanni Perone(pty:dft))(Jewett, Bradley)
October 17, 2023 Filing 195 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Strong counsel for Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone. Meghan Strong is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant EMAX Holdings, LLC. (Strong, Meghan)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER CORRECTED THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #191 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The deadline for Defendants to answer the Corrected Third Amended Class Action Complaint is EXTENDED to November 21, 2023. (iv)
October 13, 2023 Filing 193 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #191 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Corrected Third Amended Class Action Complaint)(Strong, Meghan)
October 13, 2023 Filing 192 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation #191 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
October 12, 2023 Filing 191 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint/Petition, #190 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone.(Strong, Meghan)
October 6, 2023 Filing 190 CORRECTED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #163 , filed by plaintiffs Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca(Jasnoch, John)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS #171 #172 #173 #174 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiffs will re-file their TAC with the correct numbering of their claims by October 6, 2023. Defendants will file their Answers to the remaining claims by October 24, 2023. (iv)
September 25, 2023 Filing 188 MINUTES OF ZOOM DEFENDANT FLOYD MAYWEATHER'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #171 ; DEFENDANTS GIOVANNI PERONE AND EMAX HOLDINGS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #172 ; DEFENDANT PAUL PIERCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #173 ; DEFENDANT JONA RECHNITZ'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #174 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Kathy Stride. (iv)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KARDASHIAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #169 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Because Plaintiffs filed a Notice of Non- Opposition, the Kardashian Motion is GRANTED. Specifically, the Motion as to Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief as to Kardashian is GRANTED without leave to amend. Plaintiffs' first claim for relief against Kardashian, to the extent it relies on violations of state securities law, is also DISMISSED with prejudice. (iv)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #169 #171 #172 #173 #174 (the "Motions"). At the request of counsel #184 #185 and with the Court's approval, the hearing on the Motions will be held by Zoom; no in-person appearances shall be made. The time of the hearing is ADVANCED to 9:00 a.m. on 9/25/2023 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Zoom login link is here: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-michael-w-fitzgerald. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 18, 2023 Filing 185 REQUEST for Leave of Defendants' Counsel to Appear for Via Remote Means at Motion to Dismiss Hearing Presently Set for September 25, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Honorable Michael W. Fitzgerald filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, James)
September 18, 2023 Filing 184 REQUEST for Leave of Defendants' Counsel to Appear for Via Remote Means at Motion to Dismiss Hearing filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. Request set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, James)
September 6, 2023 Filing 183 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #173 filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
September 6, 2023 Filing 182 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #174 filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Lane, Brittany)
September 6, 2023 Filing 181 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #171 filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. (Sanders, James)
September 6, 2023 Filing 180 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #172 filed by Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone. (Strong, Meghan)
August 22, 2023 Filing 179 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #173 Opposition to Defendant Pierce's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
August 22, 2023 Filing 178 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #174 Opposition to Defendant Rechnitz's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
August 22, 2023 Filing 177 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #171 Opposition to Defendant Mayweather's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
August 22, 2023 Filing 176 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #169 Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant Kardashian's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
August 22, 2023 Filing 175 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint #172 Opposition to Defendants Perone's and EMAX Holdings, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
August 1, 2023 Filing 174 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lane, Brittany)
August 1, 2023 Filing 173 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weiner, Joel)
August 1, 2023 Filing 172 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Strong, Meghan)
August 1, 2023 Filing 171 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hyun, Charles)
August 1, 2023 Filing 170 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles P Hyun counsel for Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. Adding Charles P. Hyun as counsel of record for Floyd Mayweather, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. (Attorney Charles P Hyun added to party Floyd Mayweather, Jr. (pty:dft))(Hyun, Charles)
August 1, 2023 Filing 169 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 9/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE #167 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Third Amended Class Action Complaint by August 1, 2023. (iv)
July 12, 2023 Filing 167 STIPULATION for Order to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Class Action Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lane, Brittany)
July 6, 2023 Filing 166 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah, of Third Amended Class Action Complaint on Justin Maher served on 6/28/2023. (Jasnoch, John)
July 6, 2023 Filing 165 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah, of Third Amended Class Action Complaint on Russell Davis served on 6/28/2023. (Jasnoch, John)
July 6, 2023 Filing 164 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah, of the Third Amended Class Action Complaint on Mike Speer served on 6/28/2023. (Jasnoch, John)
June 26, 2023 Filing 163 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 , filed by plaintiffs Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca(Jasnoch, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Kimberly Kardashian for Court Reporter. Court will contact Max Sladek de la Cal at msladekdelacal@cooley.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Sladek De La Cal, Maximilian)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE #119 , #120 , #121 , #122 , #123 , #124 , #126 , #127 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint, if any, by no later than June 26, 2023. Defendants must respond to any amended complaint by no later than July 17, 2023. (iv)
May 30, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings May 16, 2023 re Transcript #159 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 30, 2023 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on May 16, 2023. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2023. (Diaz, Amy)
May 17, 2023 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mara Waligurski at mwaligurski@scott-scott.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Jasnoch, John)
May 16, 2023 Filing 157 MINUTES OF ZOOM DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT'S STATE CONSUMER LAW AND COMMON LAW CLAIMS #119 ; DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS SECURITIES CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #120 ; DEFENDANT KIM KARDASHIAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #121 ; DEFENDANT FLOYD MAYWEATHER, JR.'S JOINDER IN THE OMNIBUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND INDIVIDUAL MOTION TO DISMISS #122 ; DEFENDANTS EMAX HOLDINGS, LLC, GIOVANNI PERONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #123 ; DEFENDANT PAUL PIERCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #124 ; DEFENDANT JONA RECHNITZ'S INDIVIDUAL MOTION TO DISMISS #126 ; MOTION OF DEFENDANT JONA RECHNITZ TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #127 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
May 9, 2023 Filing 156 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark A Wooster counsel for Defendant Paul Pierce. Adding Mark A. Wooster as counsel of record for Defendant Paul Pierce for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Wooster, Mark)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion and after conferring with counsel, the hearing on the Motions (ECF Nos. 119, 120, 121, 122, 123, 124, 126, 127) is continued to 9:00 AM on 5/16/2023 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The hearing will take place via Zoom. The Zoom link has been emailed to counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER ADVANCING TIME OF HEARING by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's own motion and in addition to counsel's Request #151 , the hearing on the Motions (ECF Nos. 119, 120, 121, 122, 123, 124, 126, 127) is ADVANCED TO 9:00 a.m. on 5/15/2023 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The hearing will take place via Zoom, only. The Zoom link can found on the Court's website. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 8, 2023 Filing 153 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #152 , Joint REQUEST to for Counsel to Appear Via Remote Means at Motion to Dismiss Hearing #151 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael)
May 8, 2023 Filing 152 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Request #151 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
May 5, 2023 Filing 151 Joint REQUEST to for Counsel to Appear Via Remote Means at Motion to Dismiss Hearing filed by Defendants Kimberly Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
May 1, 2023 Filing 150 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #124 filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
May 1, 2023 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
May 1, 2023 Filing 148 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Second Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 #127 filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Jahss, Neil)
May 1, 2023 Filing 147 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #126 filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Jahss, Neil)
May 1, 2023 Filing 146 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #121 filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
May 1, 2023 Filing 145 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #119 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action #122 filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. (Sanders, James)
May 1, 2023 Filing 144 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #123 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Strong, Meghan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 143 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #120 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Strong, Meghan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 142 REPLY Reply in support of a motion Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #119 filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
April 19, 2023 Filing 141 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mollie E Chadwick counsel for Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. Adding Mollie E. Chadwick as counsel of record for Ryan Huegerich, Jonathan Semerjian, Nabil Nahlah, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Michael Buckley, and Christopher DeLuca for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Michael Buckley, and Christopher DeLuca. (Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Tunisia Brignol(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Michael Buckley(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Marko Ciklic(pty:conpla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Christopher DeLuca(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Till Freeman(pty:conpla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Ryan Huegerich(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Nabil Nahlah(pty:conpla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Milan Puda(pty:pla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Jonathan Semerjian(pty:conpla), Attorney Mollie E Chadwick added to party Neil Shah(pty:pla))(Chadwick, Mollie)
April 3, 2023 Filing 140 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John T. Jasnoch in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A - SEC Press Release, #3 Exhibit B - SEC Order)(Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 139 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Second Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 #127 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Jona Rechnitz's Motion to Strike Portions of Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 138 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #126 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Rechnitz's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 137 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #124 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Paul Pierce's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 136 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #123 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Perone's and EMAX Holdings LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 135 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #119 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action #122 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Mayweather's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 134 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #121 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Kardashian's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 133 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #120 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 132 OPPOSITION to Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #119 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint's State Consumer Law and Common Law Claims filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 131 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings November 7, 2022 re Transcript #130 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2023 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on November 7, 2022. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2023. (Diaz, Amy)
February 24, 2023 Filing 129 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #128 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 22, 2023 Filing 128 Notice of Withdrawal of Meghan H. Strong as Counsel for Defendants Paul Pierce, Floyd Mayweather, Jr. and Jona Rechnitz filed by Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone. (Strong, Meghan)
February 21, 2023 Filing 127 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Portions of Second Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Jahss, Neil)
February 21, 2023 Filing 126 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jahss, Neil)
February 21, 2023 Filing 125 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #124 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
February 21, 2023 Filing 124 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weiner, Joel)
February 21, 2023 Filing 123 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants EMAX Holdings, LLC, Giovanni Perone. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Strong, Meghan)
February 21, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint #119 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #120 filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, James)
February 21, 2023 Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Securities Claims in the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant EMAX Holdings, LLC, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Giovanni Perone, Paul Pierce, Jona Rechnitz. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Meghan Strong added to party EMAX Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Floyd Mayweather, Jr. (pty:dft), Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Paul Pierce(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Jona Rechnitz(pty:dft)) (Strong, Meghan)
February 21, 2023 Filing 119 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
February 21, 2023 Filing 118 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neil Scot Jahss counsel for Defendant Jona Rechnitz. Adding Neil S. Jahss as counsel of record for Defendant Jona Rechnitz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Attorney Neil Scot Jahss added to party Jona Rechnitz(pty:dft))(Jahss, Neil)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS #116 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by February 21, 2023; If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition, if any, by April 3, 2023; Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by May 1, 2023; and The hearing on any Motion to Dismiss shall be on May 15, 2023. (iv)
January 23, 2023 Filing 116 STIPULATION for Order to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule and Page Limits filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule and Page Limits)(Strong, Meghan)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #111 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Jona Rechnitz shall serve and file any answer or response to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by February 23, 2023. (iv)
January 20, 2023 Filing 114 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brittany L Lane counsel for Defendant Jona Rechnitz. Adding Brittany L. Lane as counsel of record for Jona Rechnitz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Lane, Brittany)
January 20, 2023 Filing 113 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael V. Schafler counsel for Defendant Jona Rechnitz. Adding Michael V Schafler as counsel of record for Jona Rechnitz for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Schafler, Michael)
January 20, 2023 Filing 112 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #110 , Notice of Appearance #109 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 19, 2023 Filing 111 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jona Rechnitz answer now due 2/23/2023, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 filed by Defendant Jona Rechnitz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lane, Brittany)
January 19, 2023 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brittany L Lane on behalf of Defendant Jona Rechnitz (Attorney Brittany L Lane added to party Jona Rechnitz(pty:dft))(Lane, Brittany)
January 19, 2023 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael V. Schafler on behalf of Defendant Jona Rechnitz (Attorney Michael V. Schafler added to party Jona Rechnitz(pty:dft))(Schafler, Michael)
January 12, 2023 Filing 108 Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca. upon EMAX Holdings, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/12/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Meghan H. Strong. (Jasnoch, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 107 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Jona Rechnitz served on 1/2/2023, answer due 1/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rachel Rechnitz, Co-Occupant, and by U.S. First Class Mail in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #105 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to answer or respond to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint is extended as follows: 1. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by February 6, 2023. (lom)
January 3, 2023 Filing 105 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Giovanni Perone answer now due 2/6/2023, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
December 29, 2022 Filing 104 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 as to Defendant EMAX Holdings, LLC, Jona Rechnitz. (iv)
December 28, 2022 Filing 103 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #102 filed by plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Michael Buckley, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah. (Jasnoch, John)
December 22, 2022 Filing 102 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Antonio Brown, Russell Davis, John Does 1-10, Kimberly Kardashian, Justin Maher, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Giovanni Perone, Paul Pierce, Mike Speer, Jona Rechnitz, EMAX Holdings, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca(Jasnoch, John)
December 14, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings November 7, 2022 re Transcript #100 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Diaz, Amy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 14, 2022 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on November 7, 2022. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Amy Diaz, phone number amyfcrr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2023. (Diaz, Amy)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS AND THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS #65 , #66 , #67 , #68 , #69 , #80 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In sum, Plaintiffs fail to sufficiently state a claim for relief and the Omnibus Motion is GRANTED in full, and with leave to amend all claims except the CLRA claim, which is DISMISSED with prejudice. Additionally, all claims against Defendant Gentile are DISMISSED without prejudice as this court lacks personal jurisdiction over him. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint, if any, by no later than December 22, 2022. Defendants must respond to any amended complaint by no later than January 13, 2023. (iv)
November 7, 2022 Filing 98 MINUTES OF ZOOM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #65 ; DEFENDANT GIOVANNI PERONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #66 ; DEFENDANT STEPHEN GENTILE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #67 ; DEFENDANT KIM KARDASHIAN'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #68 ; DEFENDANT PAUL PIERCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #69 ; MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #80 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk issues the Court's tentative ruling, prior to the hearing. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (rolm)
November 2, 2022 Filing 97 SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUANCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #65 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Kim Kardashians Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. 65] and Individual Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Dkt. 62 #80 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Giovanni Perone's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 Motion continued for hearing on 11/7/2022 to 10:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of Defendant Stephen Gentiles Application #95 for Counsel to Appear Via Remote Means, and for good cause shown, the Court ORDERS that the 11/7/2022 hearing at 10:00 a.m. on the pending Motions -- #65 #66 #67 #68 #69 and #80 will be held by Zoom ONLY. Judge Fitzgeralds Zoom Information is available here: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-michael-w-fitzgerald. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 25, 2022 Filing 95 Defendant Stephen Gentiles Application For His Counsel to Appear Remote Means at Motion to Dismiss Hearing filed by Defendant Steve Gentile re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #65 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #76 , Reply (Motion related) #87 (Klein, Corey)
October 24, 2022 Filing 94 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian to Request for Judicial Notice, #85 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice (Jasnoch, John)
October 24, 2022 Filing 93 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. 65] and Individual Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Dkt. 62 #80 filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. (Sanders, James)
October 17, 2022 Filing 92 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. 65] and Individual Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Dkt. 62 #80 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Mayweather's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 91 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #69 filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
October 14, 2022 Filing 90 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Kim Kardashians Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #68 filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
October 14, 2022 Filing 89 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice, #85 filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
October 14, 2022 Filing 88 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Giovanni Perone's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Michaelson, Andrew)
October 14, 2022 Filing 87 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 the Consolidated Class Action of Complaint filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Klein, Corey)
October 14, 2022 Filing 86 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #65 filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Filing 85 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John T. Jasnoch in Support of Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A - SEC Press Release, #3 Exhibit B - SEC Order)(Jasnoch, John)
October 5, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr., identifying NONE. (Sanders, James)
September 29, 2022 Filing 83 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Motion to Dismiss #80 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (iv)
September 28, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Motion to Dismiss #80 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
September 26, 2022 Filing 81 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. 65] and Individual Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Dkt. 62 #80 filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Sanders, James)
September 26, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Dkt. 65] and Individual Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Dkt. 62 filed by Defendant Floyd Mayweather, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 11/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney James L Sanders added to party Floyd Mayweather, Jr. (pty:dft)) (Sanders, James)
September 16, 2022 Filing 79 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #69 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
September 16, 2022 Filing 78 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Giovanni Perone's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
September 16, 2022 Filing 77 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Kim Kardashians Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #68 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
September 16, 2022 Filing 76 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
September 16, 2022 Filing 75 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #65 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Christopher DeLuca, Ryan Huegerich, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, Consol Plaintiffs Marko Ciklic, Till Freeman, Nabil Nahlah, Jonathan Semerjian. (Jasnoch, John)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITATIONS #73 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that the deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is extended and that the page limits are modified as follows: Plaintiffs shall serve and file any answer or response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 9/16/2022. Defendants shall serve and file any replies to Plaintiffs' oppositionbriefs by 10/14/2022. The hearing on the Motions ( #65 #66 #67 #68 and #69 ) is CONTINUED from 10/17/2022 to 11/7/2022 at 10:00 AM. (See Order for further specifics). (jp)
August 25, 2022 Filing 73 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Giovanni Perone's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #66 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #67 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Kim Kardashians Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #68 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities #65 , STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Opposition Briefs to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, and Replies Thereto filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John)
August 15, 2022 Filing 72 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael G Rhodes counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Joseph D. Mornin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kim Kardashian. (Rhodes, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 71 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Paul Pierce, identifying Plaintiffs Paul Huegerich, Jonathan Semerjian, Nabil Nahlah, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, and Christopher DeLuca; and Defendants Steve Gentile, Giovanni Perone, Justin French, Mike Speer, Justin Maher, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Paul Pierce, Russell Davis, and Antonio Brown. (Weiner, Joel)
July 29, 2022 Filing 70 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint #69 filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
July 29, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joel R Weiner added to party Paul Pierce(pty:dft)) (Weiner, Joel)
July 29, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Kim Kardashians Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Stephen Gentile's Motion to Dismiss) (Klein, Corey)
July 29, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Giovanni Perone's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Michaelson, Andrew)
July 29, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robby Saldana to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kimberly Kardashian, designating Max Sladek de la Cal as local counsel #61 . (iv)
July 28, 2022 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca. upon Floyd Mayweather, Jr. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/27/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Carla M. Wirtschafter. (Jasnoch, John)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS #60 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants may jointly submit an omnibus motion to dismiss supported by a memorandum of points and authorities that shall not exceed 40 pages in length, excluding indices and exhibits. (iv)
July 26, 2022 Filing 61 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robby L.R. Saldana to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kimberly Kardashian (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33698515) filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sladek De La Cal, Maximilian)
July 25, 2022 Filing 60 STIPULATION for Relief from Page Limits for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
July 25, 2022 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maximilian Sladek De La Cal counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Max Sladek de la Cal as counsel of record for Kimberly Kardashian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Attorney Maximilian Sladek De La Cal added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(Sladek De La Cal, Maximilian)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONCOMPLAINT #57 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Giovanni Perone shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by July 29, 2022. (et)
July 7, 2022 Filing 57 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Giovanni Perone answer now due 7/29/2022, re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #41 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT JUSTIN MAHER TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #55 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Maher shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by July 15, 2022. (iv)
June 3, 2022 Filing 55 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 15, 2022 re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #41 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #51 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by July 15, 2022. (iv)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile, designating Corey E. Klein as local counsel. granting #50 Non-Resident Attorney Alison P. Baker (rolm)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile, designating Corey E. Klein as local counsel. granting #49 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Zeitlin (rolm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to Stipulation to Consolidate Cases #28 , Order,, Set/Clear Flags, #29 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alison P. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33363730) filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Klein, Corey)
May 25, 2022 Filing 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Zeitlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33360520) filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Klein, Corey)
May 25, 2022 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Russell Davis served on 5/21/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Russell Davis, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. granting #46 Request to Substitute Attorney. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
May 24, 2022 Filing 46 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Corey E. Klein in place of attorney Marie C. Bafus , Michael S. Dicke, David W. Feder and Melissa Lawton filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Request For Approval Of Substitution Or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Corey E Klein added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft)) (Klein, Corey)
May 13, 2022 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Mike Speer served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsey Speer, Wife/Co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
May 13, 2022 Filing 44 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Justin Maher served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Maher, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 43 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #41 as to Defendant Antonio Brown, Russell Davis, Justin Maher, Mike Speer. (iv)
April 22, 2022 Filing 42 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #41 filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah. (Jasnoch, John)
April 18, 2022 Filing 41 First (Consolidated) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Defendant X, John Does 1-10, Justin French, Steve Gentile, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Giovanni Perone, Paul Pierce, Mike Speer, Justin Maher, Russell Davis, Antonio Brown amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Jonathan Semerjian, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Neil Shah, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda(Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Tunisia Brignol(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Milan Puda(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Neil Shah(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Christopher DeLuca(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpentino to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone, designating David Willingham as local counsel #39 . (iv)
March 30, 2022 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpenito to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/15/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32951357) filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willingham, David)
March 18, 2022 Filing 38 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice (C. Carpenito) #36 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 3/25/2022. (iv)
March 16, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpenito to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32951357) #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section I of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
March 15, 2022 Filing 36 **STRICKEN** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpenito to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32951357) filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willingham, David) Modified on 3/18/2022 Per Response #38 (iv).
March 11, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 10, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael S Dicke on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Attorney Michael S Dicke added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft))(Dicke, Michael)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steve Gentile, designating Melissa Lawton as local counsel #32 . (iv)
March 4, 2022 Filing 32 REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney David W. Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32892204) filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lawton, Melissa)
March 4, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melissa Leigh Lawton counsel for Defendant Steve Gentile. Adding Melissa L. Lawton as counsel of record for Steve Gentile for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attorney Melissa Leigh Lawton added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft))(Lawton, Melissa)
March 3, 2022 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steve Gentile, (Bafus, Marie)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION; APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL; SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSES THERETO; and CLOSING CASE NO. CV 22-400 UPON CONSOLIDATION #28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than April 18, 2022. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint 45 days after service of the Consolidated Complaint. (iv)
March 2, 2022 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:22-cv-00400 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Michaelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone, designating David Willingham as local counsel #26 . (iv)
February 2, 2022 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Michaelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32729153) filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willingham, David)
February 2, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Karl Willingham counsel for Defendant Giovanni Perone. Adding David Karl Willingham as counsel of record for Giovanni Perone for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attorney David Karl Willingham added to party Giovanni Perone(pty:dft))(Willingham, David)
February 2, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone, (Strong, Meghan)
February 1, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Steve Gentile answer now due 3/9/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Steve Gentile.(Bafus, Marie)
February 1, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marie Bafus counsel for Defendant Steve Gentile. Adding Marie C. Bafus as counsel of record for Steve Gentile for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Steve Gentile. (Attorney Marie Bafus added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft))(Bafus, Marie)
January 31, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian, (Rhodes, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Paul Pierce answer now due 3/4/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich.(Jasnoch, John)
January 27, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Giovanni Perone answer now due 3/4/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone Giovanni Perone.(Strong, Meghan)
January 27, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Strong counsel for Defendant Giovanni Perone. Adding Meghan H. Strong as counsel of record for Defendant Giovanni Perone for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Giovanni Perone(pty:dft))(Strong, Meghan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Justin French served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin French in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
January 24, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Giovanni Perone served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Giovanni Perone in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
January 24, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Steve Gentile served on 1/15/2022, answer due 2/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Gentile in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Paul Pierce served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Pierce in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. upon Kimberly Kardashian waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Michael G. Rhodes. (Jasnoch, John)
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph D Mornin counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Joseph D. Mornin as counsel of record for Kim Kardashian West for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kim Kardashian West. (Attorney Joseph D Mornin added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(Mornin, Joseph)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Travis LeBlanc counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Travis LeBlanc as counsel of record for Kim Kardashian West for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kim Kardashian West. (Attorney Travis LeBlanc added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(LeBlanc, Travis)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Justin French, Steve Gentile, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Giovanni Perone and Paul Pierce. (jtil)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael G Rhodes counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Michael G. Rhodes as counsel of record for Kimberly Kardashian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Attorney Michael G Rhodes added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(Rhodes, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, identifying n/a. (Jasnoch, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of John T. Jasnoch Declaration Regarding Proper Venue Pursuant to Cal. Civil Code 1780(D) filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Jasnoch, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Jasnoch, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Jasnoch, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32588084 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Ryan Huegerich(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Ethereummax Investor Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Huegerich
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher DeLuca
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Shah
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunisia Brignol
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan Puda
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Buckley
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gentile
Represented By: Marie Bafus
Represented By: David W. Feder
Represented By: Melissa Leigh Lawton
Represented By: Corey E. Klein
Represented By: Alison P. Baker
Represented By: Andrew M. Zeitlin
Represented By: Michael S Dicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Perone
Represented By: Andrew Michaelson
Represented By: David Karl Willingham
Represented By: Meghan Strong
Represented By: Craig Carpenito
Represented By: Andrew Z. Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Kardashian
Represented By: Michael G Rhodes
Represented By: Joseph D Mornin
Represented By: Travis LeBlanc
Represented By: Robby L. R. Saldana
Represented By: Maximilian Sladek De La Cal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Mayweather, Jr.
Represented By: James L Sanders
Represented By: Carla M. Wirtschafter
Represented By: Meghan Strong
Represented By: Charles P Hyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pierce
Represented By: Joel R Weiner
Represented By: Meghan Strong
Represented By: Mark A Wooster
Represented By: Sarah J Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jona Rechnitz
Represented By: Brittany L Lane
Represented By: Michael V. Schafler
Represented By: Neil Scot Jahss
Represented By: Meghan Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMAX Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Meghan Strong
Represented By: David Karl Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonathan Semerjian
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nabil Nahlah
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Till Freeman
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marko Ciklic
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Represented By: Mollie E Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?