Stan Evans v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stan Evans
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Facebook, Inc. and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00225
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Meta Platforms, Inc. answer now due 3/22/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc..(Attorney Joseph Charles Gratz added to party Meta Platforms, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gratz, Joseph)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan A. Hoerschelmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stan Evans, designating Ismail Amin as local counsel #13 . (gk)
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan A. Hoerschelmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stan Evans (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32727260) filed by Plaintiff Stan Evans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Amin, Ismail)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Stan Evans. (Amin, Ismail)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff's counsel must IMMEDIATELY file an AR 120 Notice as required by Local Rule 3-1 and as directed by Dkt. No. 9. If counsel does not file the AO 120 by February 3, 2022, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute and for failure to follow court orders. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. (et)
January 12, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Stan Evans. (Amin, Ismail)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stan Evans, (Amin, Ismail)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stan Evans. (Amin, Ismail)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32604816 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Stan Evans. (Attorney Ismail Amin added to party Stan Evans(pty:pla))(Amin, Ismail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stan Evans v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Evans
Represented By: Ismail Amin
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Meade
Represented By: Nathan A. Hoerschelmann
Represented By: Scott Michael Halberstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joyce Li
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?