Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery v. Aetna Health of California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery
Defendant: Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00348
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Plaintiffs have filed an Amended Complaint #16 . The pending Motion to Dismiss the original complaint #15 is therefore terminated as MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 17, 2022 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Aetna Life Insurance Company, Does amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Nesbit, Alan)
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 4/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Herman, Jonathan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 14 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company (Herman, Jonathan)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-006) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00348 MEMF(JEMx). (rn)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company (Herman, Jonathan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aetna Health of California, Inc. (Herman, Jonathan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company, (Herman, Jonathan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Herman, Jonathan)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for March 7, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. (see document for further details) (bm)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See attached document for details) (mrgo)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. It should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. (et)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
January 18, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company, Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/1/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED AS ATTACHMENT NO.4 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
January 18, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 4 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV43856 Receipt No: ACACDC-32633382 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Aetna Health of California, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lisa Adinolfi, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #6 Exhibit Answer, #7 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman added to party Aetna Health of California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Marc Herman added to party Aetna Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Herman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery v. Aetna Health of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Center for Oral and Maxillofacial Surgery
Represented By: Alan Nesbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health of California, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?