Arin Esraelian v. The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Arin Esraelian
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00413
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. The Jury Trial is set for 12/20/2022 at 8:30 AM. The Pretrial Conference is set for 12/2/2022 at 08:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (See document for further details) (yl)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The hearing on March 7, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to a private mediator. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/6/2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: June 10, 2022. (yl)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-07526 VAP(KESx) (rn)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14-21 days, filed by Plaintiff Arin Esraelian.. (Carney, Janelle)
February 1, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Janelle Carney as Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Arin Esraelian. (Carney, Janelle)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alecia Winfield filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Winfield, Alecia)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:15-cv-05745 RGK(PJWx) (rn)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Serving Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Companys Notice To State Court And Adverse Parties Of Removal Of Action To Federal Court On Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Winfield, Alecia)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for March 7, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before February 22, 2022. (iv)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jp)
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp)
January 20, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NO. 1-8 OF EXHIBIT F TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
January 20, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT iled by plaintiff Arin Esraelian against Defendants The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Does 1-50. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/08/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED NO. 1-4 OF EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Alecia Winfield re Notice of Related Case(s) #5 filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alecia Winfield in Re Notice of Related Cases (Case No. 2:15-CV-05745 RGK-PJWx), #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alecia Winfield in Re Notice of Related Cases (re Case No. 2:15-CV-05745 RGK-PJWx ), #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Alecia Winfield in Re Notice of Related Cases (re Case No. No 2:21-CV-07526 VAP-KESx), #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Alecia Winfield in Re Notice of Related Cases (re Case No. No 2:21-CV-07526 VAP-KESx))(Winfield, Alecia)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Related Case(s): Case No. 2:15-CV-05745 RGK-PJWx; Case No. 2:21-CV-07526 VAP-KESx (Winfield, Alecia)
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, identifying Plaintiff Arin Esraelian; Mahoney Law Group, APC Counsel for Plaintiff; Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; BlackRock, Inc. (owns more than 10% of Defendants stock) and; Littler Mendelson, P.C. Counsel for Defendant. (Winfield, Alecia)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Goodyear is a publicly traded corporation; it has no parent corporation; and the publicly held company, BlackRock, Inc., owns more than 10% of Goodyears stock as Corporate Parent. (Winfield, Alecia)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Winfield, Alecia)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Central, case number 21STCV44620 Receipt No: ACACDC-32651998 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Susan K. Buckley In Support Of Removal Of Civil Action From State Court, #2 Declaration Of Alecia Winfield In Support Of Removal Of Civil Action From State Court, #3 Exhibit A In Support of Removal (Complaint), #4 Exhibit B In Support of Removal (Summons Document Package), #5 Exhibit C In Support of Removal (Initial Status Conference Order & Minute Order re Initial Status Conference), #6 Exhibit D In Support of Removal (Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint), #7 Exhibit E In Support of Removal (Notice of Minute Order and Initial Status Conference), #8 Exhibit F In Support of Removal (Defendant's Answer to Complaint)) (Attorney Alecia W Winfield added to party The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Winfield, Alecia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arin Esraelian v. The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arin Esraelian
Represented By: John Adam Young
Represented By: Janelle C Carney
Represented By: Kevin Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Alecia W Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Jamar Deshawn Davis
Represented By: Alecia W Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?