Marzieh Amidnamin et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Marzieh Amidnamin and Mannochehr Amidnamin
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Sunrise Ford and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00505
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION #20 TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. *See order for new deadlines imposed.* (vdr)
March 17, 2023 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #14 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanderhoof, Brian)
January 27, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 12, 2023 Filing 18 Notice Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Mannochehr Amidnamin, Marzieh Amidnamin. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 4, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Whang counsel for Plaintiffs Mannochehr Amidnamin, Marzieh Amidnamin. Adding Steven Whang as counsel of record for Mannochehr Amidnamin and Marzieh Amidnamin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Mannochehr Amidnamin and Marzieh Amidnamin. (Attorney Steven Whang added to party Mannochehr Amidnamin(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Whang added to party Marzieh Amidnamin(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
June 16, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict re: name of party. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 14, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Mannochehr Amidnamin, Marzieh Amidnamin. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Marzieh Amidnamin and Mannochehr Amidnamin. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 10/3/2022. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 3/31/2023. Last Day to Hear Motions 5/1/2023. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 6/26/2023. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/17/2023 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 Days) set for 8/8/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/19/2023. (iv)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08 and Order of the Chief Judge 22-002, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 to 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Mannochehr Amidnamin, Marzieh Amidnamin.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Conformed Answer to Complaint re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) (Won, Jonathan)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-00505 MWF(SKx). (rn)
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Mannochehr Amidnamin, Marzieh Amidnamin (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Mannochehr Amidnamin(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Marzieh Amidnamin(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/07/22 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car)
January 24, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company, Sunrise Ford. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Marzieh Amidnamin, Mannochehr Amidnamin. Filed in State Court on 9/22/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
January 24, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Submitted with Attachment 3 pg 430 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
January 24, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Marzieh Amidnamin, Mannochehr Amidnamin pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sunrise Ford Without Prejudice. Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; BlackRock, Inc. The Vanguard Group. (Won, Jonathan)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Won, Jonathan)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV34909 Receipt No: ACACDC-32670054 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Won) (Attorney Jonathan Won added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Won, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marzieh Amidnamin et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marzieh Amidnamin
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Steven Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mannochehr Amidnamin
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Steven Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jonathan Won
Represented By: Brian C Vanderhoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?