Tammy Jane Owen et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Estate Plaintiff: Tammy Jane Owen
Case Number: 2:2022cv00550
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 50 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Mukiibi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/16/2022, Receipt No. 32961586) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 22, 2022 Filing 49 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kimberly A Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/16/2022, Receipt No. 32961586) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 22, 2022 Filing 48 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Irene R Lax to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/16/2022, Receipt No. 32961581) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 22, 2022 Filing 47 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carla Agbiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/16/2022, Receipt No. 32961579) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 17, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Mukiibi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961592) #45 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kimberly A Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961586) #44 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Irene R Lax to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961584) #43 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Carla Agbiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961581) #42 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (sbou)
March 16, 2022 Filing 45 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Mukiibi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961592) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 16, 2022 Filing 44 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kimberly A Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961586) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 16, 2022 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Irene R Lax to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961584) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 16, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Carla Agbiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32961581) filed by Local Counsel Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 14, 2022 Filing 41 Notice of Entry of Appearance (Kurichety, Karlyn)
March 4, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General.(Zee, Michael)
March 4, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Andrew Zee on behalf of Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attorney Michael Andrew Zee added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Andrew Zee added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Andrew Zee added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Zee, Michael)
March 2, 2022 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Individual. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
March 2, 2022 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Individual. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
March 2, 2022 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Individual. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 16, 2022 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Oscar Ortiz. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties served on 2/8/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature is not legible. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature is not legible. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General served on 2/7/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 15, 2022 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen, Al Otro Lado, Inc., upon Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 2/7/2022, answer due 4/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature is not legible. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Graham, Mary)
February 2, 2022 Filing 29 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (lom)
February 2, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Samuel Mukibi on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Counsel is awaiting Certificates of Good Standing from each state bar he is a member and upon receipt will apply for permission to appear Pro Hac Vice. (lt)
February 2, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Irene R. Lax on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Counsel is awaiting Certificates of Good Standing from each state bar she is a member and upon receipt will apply for permission to appear Pro Hac Vice. (lt)
February 2, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Kimberly A. Evans on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Counsel is awaiting Certificates of Good Standing from each state bar she is a member and upon receipt will apply for permission to appear Pro Hac Vice. (lt)
February 2, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Carla Agbiro on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Counsel is awaiting Certificates of Good Standing from each state bar she is a member and upon receipt will apply for permission to appear Pro Hac Vice. (lt)
February 1, 2022 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 31, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #22 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
January 31, 2022 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 28, 2022 Filing 21 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Summon Issued as to US DHS - Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, #2 Summon Issued as to US DHS - Civil Process Clerk - LA, #3 Summon Issued as to US DHS - Office of Inspector General - LA, #4 Summon Issued as to US ICE - AUSA - Washington DC, #5 Summon Issued as to US AUSA - Washington DC, #6 Summon Issued as to US ICS - DHS - Washington DC, #7 Summon Issued as to US DHS - OFC of General Counsel - Washington DC, #8 Summon Issued as to US DHS - Ofc of the General Counsel - US DHS - Washington DC) (jp)
January 26, 2022 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Tammy Jane Owen, as Administrator of the Estate of Benjamin James Owen, and Al Otro Lado, Inc. All Plaintiffs, identifying Al Otro Lado, Tammy Jane Owen. (Graham, Mary)
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Irene R. Lax. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carla Agbiro. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Samuel Mukiibi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kimberly A. Evans. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32680544 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tammy Jane Owen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mary Elizabeth Graham added to party Tammy Jane Owen(pty:estp))(Graham, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tammy Jane Owen et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Represented By: Karlyn Hahn Bell Kurichety
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Graham
Represented By: Carla Agbiro
Represented By: Irene R Lax
Represented By: Kimberly A Evans
Represented By: Samuel Mukiibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Tammy Jane Owen
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security-Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security - Office of Inspector General
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?