Henry Koltys v. Chad F. Wolf et al.
Plaintiff: Henry Koltys
Defendant: Andrew M Saul, Acting Secretary CHAD F WOLF and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2022cv00655
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 63 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference previously scheduled for 03/07/2022 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 2, 2022 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Steven L. Herrick #36 , #45 filed by Plaintiff Henry Koltys. (Herrick, Steven)
February 14, 2022 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Bartholomew Green counsel for Defendants Kilolo Kijakazi, CHAD F WOLF. Adding Paul B. Green as counsel of record for Chad F. Wolf and Kilolo Kijakazi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Chad F. Wolf and Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Bartholomew Green added to party CHAD F WOLF(pty:dft))(Green, Paul)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/7/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
January 31, 2022 Filing 58 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 31, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 31, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
January 31, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:20-cv-08700-SK, from USDC Northern District of California (San Francisco). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:22-cv-00655-SVW (Ex). (et)
January 31, 2022 Filing 54 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim regarding #36 Motion for Summary Judgment and #45 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, to Dismiss, or to Transfer Venue. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE re: Consent to Change of Venue by Henry Koltys (Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 1/26/2022) Modified on 1/27/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 24, 2022 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2022 re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed by Chad F. Wolf, Kilolo Kijakazi and #45 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Henry Koltys. Matter is taken under submission. The Court will issue a written order. Zoom Recording Time: 9:39-9:46. Attorney for Plaintiff: Steven Herrick. Attorney for Defendants: Pamela Johann. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Filing 50 REPLY (re #45 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byHenry Koltys. (Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Mary Ann Zimmerman in Support of #48 REPLY RE MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CROSSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 1/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Filing 48 DEFENDANTS REPLY RE MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer, #45 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Kilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 1/5/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #46 Stipulation to Extend Reply Deadline. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 1/5/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Filing 46 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Briefing Schedule filed by Kilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 12/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORNADUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Henry Koltys. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2022 09:30 AM in Do Not Use Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Henry Koltys, #2 Exhibit Email dated March 11, 2020, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Cheri Cannon, #4 Exhibit Hillard Heintze Report, #5 Proposed Order) (Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2021) Modified on 12/2/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Filing 44 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer ) filed by Henry Koltys. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Henry Koltys, #2 Exhibit Email dated March 11, 2020, #3 Affidavit of Cheri Cannon, #4 Exhibit Hillard Heintze Report, #5 Exhibit Various emails)(Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 12/1/2021) Modified on 12/2/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AS MODIFIED by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #42 Stipulation to Extend Time. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
November 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer. Opposition/Cross-Motion due by 12/1/2021. Replies due by 12/22/2021. Motion Hearing reset for 1/24/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court procee dings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (mkl, COUR T STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
November 16, 2021 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Henry Koltys. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven L. Herrick)(Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 41 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann in Support of #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed byKilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 40 Declaration of Mark S. Sochaczewsky in Support of #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed byKilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 39 Declaration of Brian Rudick in Support of #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed byKilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 38 Declaration of Mary Ann Zimmerman in Support of #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed byKilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 37 Declaration of Celeste E. Cook in Support of #36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed byKilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Motion to Dismiss or to Transfer filed by Kilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 11/17/2021. Replies due by 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #34 Stipulation and Vacating Case Management Conference. Motions due by 10/20/2021. Cross Motions due by 11/17/2021. Replies due by 12/8/2021. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER regarding Briefing Schedule and Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order Vacating Case Management Conference filed by Kilolo Kijakazi, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #31 Stipulation Regarding Response Date and Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/4/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT and STIPULATION re Response Date and Continuing CMC; [Proposed] Order filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/23/2021) Modified on 8/24/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 30 ELEVENTH STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/2/2021) Modified on 8/3/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
July 12, 2021 Filing 29 TENTH STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/12/2021) Modified on 7/13/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #27 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/30/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing CMC filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 6/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 25 EIGHTH STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Response Date filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 6/4/2021) Modified on 6/4/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #22 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/12/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 SEVENTH STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT Status Report; STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 5/17/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
April 29, 2021 Filing 21 SIXTH STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 5/18/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 5/17/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/24/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/20/2021. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 FIFTH STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 FOURTH STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/2/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 THIRD STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/5/2021) Modified on 3/5/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie KIm granting #14 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Exempt Parties from Certain Rule 26 Requirements. Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC and Exempt Parties from Certain Rule 26 Requirements filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela T. Johann)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 2/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/17/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 SECOND STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 2/3/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Koltys (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Notice of Proof of Service - Wolf (Anderson), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Notice of Proof of Service by Certified Mail - Saul (Barr), #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Notice of Proof of Service by Certified Mail - Wolf, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Notice of Proof of Service by Certififed Mail - Wolf (Barr))(Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 1/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Andrew M. Saul, Chad F. Wolf. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Henry Koltys.. (Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 12/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Chad F. Wolf. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/23/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-15294195). Filed by Henry Koltys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrick, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/31/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Koltys v. Chad F. Wolf et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Koltys
Represented By: Steven L Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Pamela T Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary CHAD F WOLF
Represented By: Pamela T Johann
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Pamela T Johann
Represented By: Paul Bartholomew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?