Commodity Futures Trading Commission et al v. Safeguard Metals LLC et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Alabama Securities Commission, Arizona Corporation Commission, Arkansas Securities Department, California Department of Financial Protection & Innovation, State of Connecticut Department of Banking, State of Florida, Office of Financial Regulation, State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, Idaho Department of Finance, Office of the Secretary of State, Illinois Securities Department, Indiana Securities Division, Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions, State of Maryland Ex Rel the Maryland Securities Commissioner, Attorney General Dana Nessel on Behalf of the People of the State of Michigan, Mississippi Secretary of State, Missouri Commissioner of Securities, Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance, New Mexico Securities Division, The People of the State of New York by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, North Carolina Department of the Secretary of State, Oklahoma Department of Securities, Oregon Department of Business and Consumer Services, South Carolina Attorney General, South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation, Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance, Vermont Department of Financial Regulation, Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, State of Wisconsin, California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation, Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance, South Dakota Department of Labor and Regulation and The State of Wisconsin
Defendant: Jeffrey Santulan, Safeguard Metals LLC and Jeffrey Hill
Case Number: 2:2022cv00691
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 80 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $500.00 from Mississippi State. Re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #75 . Receipt number LA234565. (jo)
February 10, 2022 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Jeff Le Riche re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Ashley, Clemon)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State Department of Financial Institutions, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #67 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Clayton Grueb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff South Dakota Department of Labor, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel. #64 (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Appliction Non-Resident Attorney Alissa Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff New Mexico Securities Division, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #63 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application Non-Resident Attorney Seth Shannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mississippi Secretary of State, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #62 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application Non-Resident Attorney Michael Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Attorney General Dana Nessel, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #61 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Max Brauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Maryland, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #59 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gary Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Kentucky, Department of Financial Institutions, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #58 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Anne Gunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alabama Securities Commission, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #57 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Clemon Ashley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #56 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Feaga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Alabama Securities Commission, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #55 . (iv)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Arizona Corporation Commission, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #50 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Filing 67 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State Department of Financial Institutions (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/4/2022, Receipt No. LA234080) filed by Plaintiff Washington State Department of Financial Institutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Suk, Kelly)
February 4, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State Department of Financial Institutions (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) #65 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Failed to list Washington bar membership. (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 65 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State Department of Financial Institutions (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Washington State Department of Financial Institutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen S. Manning added to party Washington State Department of Financial Institutions(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clayton E. Grueb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff South Dakota Department of Labor and Regulation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff South Dakota Department of Labor and Regulation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Clayton E. Grueb added to party South Dakota Department of Labor and Regulation (pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 63 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alissa N. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff New Mexico Securities Division (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff New Mexico Securities Division. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Alissa N. Berger added to party New Mexico Securities Division(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 62 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth W. Shannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mississippi Secretary of State (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Mississippi Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Seth W. Shannon added to party Mississippi Secretary of State(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 61 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Attorney General Dana Nessel on Behalf of the People of the State of Michigan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Attorney General Dana Nessel on Behalf of the People of the State of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael S. Hill added to party Attorney General Dana Nessel on Behalf of the People of the State of Michigan(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Max F. Brauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Maryland Ex Rel the Maryland Securities Commissioner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) #59 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NY missing. (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 59 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Max F. Brauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Maryland Ex Rel the Maryland Securities Commissioner (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff State of Maryland Ex Rel the Maryland Securities Commissioner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Max F. Brauer added to party State of Maryland Ex Rel the Maryland Securities Commissioner(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 58 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary A. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Gary A. Stephens added to party Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 57 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Anne W. Gunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alabama Securities Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Alabama Securities Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anne W. Gunter added to party Alabama Securities Commission(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 56 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clemon D. Ashley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Suk, Kelly)
February 4, 2022 Filing 55 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen P. Feaga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alabama Securities Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Alabama Securities Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen P. Feaga added to party Alabama Securities Commission(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Laura McFarlane to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The State of Wisconsin, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #33 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Rood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vermont Department of Financial Regulation, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #30 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Attorney General Alan Wilson, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #29 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Oregon Department of Consumer and Business Services, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #28 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A. Nichols to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arizona Corporation Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid) filed by Plaintiff Arizona Corporation Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Christopher A. Nichols added to party Arizona Corporation Commission(pty:pla)) (lt)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert Fagnant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Oklahoma Department of Securities, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #27 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Sherrell Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North Carolina Department of the Secretary of State, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #26 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Tatyana Trakht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The People of the State of New York, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #25 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua Shassere to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #24 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steven Kretzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Missouri Commissioner of Securities, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #23 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jefferson Garn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana Secretary of State, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #22 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Paula Bouldon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Office of Illinois Secretary of State, Securities Department, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #21 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney George Bedell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Florida, Office of Financial Regulation, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #20 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Loren Messerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Idaho, Department of Finance, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #19 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Rayni Nakamura-Watanabe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #18 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney James Caley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Connecticut Department of Banking, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #17 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Joslin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Arkansas Securities Department, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #16 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Le Riche to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #15 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jefferson S. Garn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana Securities Division (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734436) #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
February 4, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clemon D. Ashley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Clemon Ashley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission, designating Kelly Suk as local counsel #14 . (iv)
February 4, 2022 Filing 33 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura E. McFarlane to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The State of Wisconsin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32737453) filed by Plaintiff The State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party The State of Wisconsin(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 4, 2022 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. upon Jeffrey Santulan waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Paul A. Rigali. (Buffa, JonMarc)
February 4, 2022 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. upon Safeguard Metals LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Paul A. Rigali. (Buffa, JonMarc)
February 3, 2022 Filing 30 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Rood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vermont Department of Financial Regulation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734877) filed by Plaintiff Vermont Department of Financial Regulation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Vermont Department of Financial Regulation(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 29 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff South Carolina Attorney General (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734836) filed by Plaintiff South Carolina Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party South Carolina Attorney General(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 28 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Rice to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Oregon Department of Business and Consumer Services (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734802) filed by Plaintiff Oregon Department of Business and Consumer Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Oregon Department of Business and Consumer Services(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 27 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert Fagnant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Oklahoma Department of Securities (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734766) filed by Plaintiff Oklahoma Department of Securities. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Oklahoma Department of Securities(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 26 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sherrell Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff North Carolina Department of the Secretary of State (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734694) filed by Plaintiff North Carolina Department of the Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party North Carolina Department of the Secretary of State(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 25 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tatyana (Tanya) Trakht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The People of the State of New York by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734639) filed by Plaintiff The People of the State of New York by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party The People of the State of New York by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 24 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua Shasserre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734560) filed by Plaintiff Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 23 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven Kretzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Missouri Commissioner of Securities (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734517) filed by Plaintiff Missouri Commissioner of Securities. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Missouri Commissioner of Securities(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 22 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jefferson S. Garn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana Securities Division (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734436) filed by Plaintiff Indiana Securities Division. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Indiana Securities Division(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 21 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paula Bouldon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Office of the Secretary of State, Illinois Securities Department (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32734378) filed by Plaintiff Office of the Secretary of State, Illinois Securities Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Office of the Secretary of State, Illinois Securities Department(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney George Bedell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Florida, Office of Financial Regulation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-32733674) filed by Plaintiff State of Florida, Office of Financial Regulation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party State of Florida, Office of Financial Regulation(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Loren Messerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Idaho Department of Finance (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32733514) filed by Plaintiff Idaho Department of Finance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party Idaho Department of Finance(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 18 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rayni M. Nakamura-Watanabe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32733380) filed by Plaintiff State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James W. Caley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Connecticut Department of Banking (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32732999) filed by Plaintiff State of Connecticut Department of Banking. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party State of Connecticut Department of Banking(pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph S. Joslin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32732814) filed by Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffery C. Le Riche to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clemon D. Ashley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kelly Suk added to party California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation (pty:pla)) (Suk, Kelly)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clemon D Ashley on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Le Riche on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jeffrey Santulan. (et)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Safeguard Metals LLC. (et)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST Notice of Related Case No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(Buffa, JonMarc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Caption Attachment, #2 Additional Defendants to be Served)(Buffa, JonMarc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Caption Attachment)(Buffa, JonMarc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Buffa, JonMarc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attorney JonMarc Philip Buffa added to party Commodity Futures Trading Commission(pty:pla))(Buffa, JonMarc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission et al v. Safeguard Metals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Santulan
Represented By: Paul Anthony Rigali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Metals LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Rigali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hill
Represented By: Paul Anthony Rigali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Clemon D. Ashley
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Le Riche
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Securities Commission
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Anne W. Gunter
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Stephen P. Feaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Corporation Commission
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Christopher A. Nichols
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Securities Department
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Joseph S. Joslin
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Department of Financial Protection & Innovation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut Department of Banking
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: James W. Caley
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida, Office of Financial Regulation
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: George C. Bedell
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Rayni M. Nakamura-Watanabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Department of Finance
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Loren K. Messerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office of the Secretary of State, Illinois Securities Department
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: David F. Buysse
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Paula K. Bouldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Securities Division
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Department of Financial Institutions
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Gary A. Stephens
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland Ex Rel the Maryland Securities Commissioner
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Max F. Brauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney General Dana Nessel on Behalf of the People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Michael S. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Secretary of State
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: James M. Rankin
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Seth W. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Commissioner of Securities
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Steven M. Kretzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Department of Banking & Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Mexico Securities Division
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Alissa N. Berger
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Tatyana Trakht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Department of the Secretary of State
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Sherrell L. Forbes
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Department of Securities
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Robert E. Fagnant, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Department of Business and Consumer Services
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Daniel J. Rice
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Attorney General
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Jonathan B. Williams
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota Department of Labor & Regulation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kevin M Kreutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Department of Financial Regulation
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Jennifer Rood
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington State Department of Financial Institutions
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Stephen S. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Department of Financial Protection and Innovation
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Danielle A Stoumbos
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Department of Banking and Finance
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Joshua R. Shasserre
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota Department of Labor and Regulation
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Clayton E. Grueb
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Wisconsin
Represented By: JonMarc Philip Buffa
Represented By: Kelly Suk
Represented By: Laura E. McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?