United States of America v. Burgerim Group USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Burgerim Group USA, Inc., Burgerim Group, Inc. and Oren Loni
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Barry S Glaser
Case Number: 2:2022cv00825
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Filing 38 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Barry S Glaser: Mediation held on October 25, 2022. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Glaser, Barry)
September 16, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for October 25, 2022.(Glaser, Barry)
September 8, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Barry S Glaser has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates (Jury Trial)) (lom)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program will assign one. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10-10-23. Joint status report re settlement due by: 10-17-23. (lom) Modified on 8/10/2022 (lom).
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on July 29, 2022. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. On July 14, 2022, the clerk entered default as to Defendants Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc. #30 . Plaintiff shall move for default judgment within 30 days after a final disposition of the pending claims against all remaining Defendants. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2022 Filing 31 Joint Rule 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Form)(Smith, Marcus)
July 14, 2022 Filing 30 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc. (gk)
July 13, 2022 Filing 29 Second APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Burgerim Group USA, Inc., Burgerim Group, Inc. filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Marcus)
June 15, 2022 Filing 28 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/15/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' Motion to Extend Time to Serve Process and to Request Entry of Default #22 is GRANTED and the 7/8/2022 hearing on the motion is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States' time to complete service of summons and complaint on Defendants Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc. is hereby extended to 6/13/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall file an application for the entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, if Defendants Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc. have not filed a response to the complaint by 7/13/2022. (gk)
June 13, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Oren Loni(individually), Oren Loni(as an officer of Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc.), identifying None. (Bronstein, Peter)
June 13, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 10, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Oren Loni(individually), Oren Loni(as an officer of Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc.).(Attorney Peter C Bronstein added to party Oren Loni(pty:dft), Attorney Peter C Bronstein added to party Oren Loni(pty:dft))(Bronstein, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Order to Show Cause dated May 11, 2022 #14 is discharged. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti)
June 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Default filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Smith, Marcus)
June 8, 2022 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022; Burgerim Group, Inc. served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Pronstein, registered agent of Burgerim Group, Inc., and Michel Buchbot, registered agent of Burgerim Group USA, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Smith, Marcus)
June 8, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michel Buchbot, registered agent of Burgerim Group USA, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Smith, Marcus)
June 8, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Bronstein, registered agent of Burgerim Group, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Smith, Marcus)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte extends the Order to Show Cause deadline to June 8, 2022 #14 . It IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Application for Entry of Default against Defendants Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc. #16 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. The Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint does not indicate the statute under which service was made. Lacking subsequent mail service. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (gk)
May 23, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc., Burgerim Group, Inc. filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default against Burgerim USA, Inc. and Burgerim, Inc.) (Tosini, Stephen)
May 20, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Oren Loni(individually) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022; Oren Loni(as an officer of Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc.) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Peter Bronstein. (Smith, Marcus)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before May 25, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See minute order for details. (lom)
April 15, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Burgerim Group USA, Inc. served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michel Buchbot, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Smith, Marcus)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Burgerim Group, Inc. served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Bronstein, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Smith, Marcus)
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen Carl Tosini on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Stephen Carl Tosini added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Tosini, Stephen)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Burgerim Group USA, Inc., Burgerim Group, Inc., Oren Loni individually and as an officer of Burgerim Group USA, Inc. and Burgerim Group, Inc. (gk)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Smith, Marcus)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Smith, Marcus)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Smith, Marcus)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Marcus Smith added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Smith, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Burgerim Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Marcus Smith
Represented By: Stephen Carl Tosini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerim Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgerim Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oren Loni
Represented By: Peter C Bronstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Barry S Glaser
Represented By: Barry S Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?