Lawrence Jones et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Jones and Patricia Jones
Defendant: FCA US LLC, FCA US, LLC, H.W. Hunter, Inc Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00859
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones and Patricia Jones. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV33473, acknowledged on 4/25/2022. (iv)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Lawrence Jones and Patricia Jones for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Lawrence Jones and Patricia Jones. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Lawrence Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Patricia Jones(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND [filed 3/22/22; Docket No. #20 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED, and this action is REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STATEMENT of of Decision Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. (Law, Daniel)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. (Law, Daniel)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. (Law, Daniel)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration James P. Mayo, #2 Exhibit A)(Mayo, James)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. (Law, Daniel)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiffs' Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plainitffs' Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2023 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 2/24/2023 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on March 21, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 5, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 9, 2022. (iv)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones, identifying Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones, and Strategic Legal Practices, APC. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lead Trial Counse)(Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Lawrence Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Patricia Jones(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James Patrick Mayo counsel for Defendant FCA US, LLC. Adding James Patrick Mayo as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATEMENT Following Local Rule 7-3 Conference in Advance of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones (Law, Daniel)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Lawrence Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Patricia Jones(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, served on February 11, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(Universal, Jon)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones, Patricia Jones. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Lawrence Jones and Patricia Jones for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Lawrence Jones and Patricia Jones. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Lawrence Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Patricia Jones(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for March 21, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before March 3, 2022. (iv)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC, served on February 9, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party)(Universal, Jon)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Certificate of Interested Parties and No. 4 Notice of Appearance should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US, LLC, H.W. Hunter, Inc Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Jones, Lawrence Jones. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Jones, Lawrence Jones pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court, rules 3.760 and 3.770 as to H.W. Hunter, Inc Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants FCA US, LLC, H.W. Hunter, Inc Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV33473 Receipt No: ACACDC-32755319 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Declaration Jon D. Universal, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Demand for Jury Trial) (Attorney Jon David Universal added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Universal, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence Jones et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Jones
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Jaleceia VaShayla White
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jones
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Jaleceia VaShayla White
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Jon David Universal
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.W. Hunter, Inc Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Fiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?