Reynauld Hampton v. Cook Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reynauld Hampton
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical LLC f/k/a Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS, Cook Medical LLC and Cook Medical Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2022cv00876
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Indiana, 1:22-cv-06743 filed 2/25/2022. (iv)
February 25, 2022 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 192) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2570, transferring case to USDC Southern District of Indiana and assigned to Honorable Richard L. Young. Case transferred electronically on 2/25/2012. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 2/25/2022 (lc).
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Courts Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who havepending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Courts Website and Judges procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties identifying Cook Group, Inc., Cook Medical, LLC, f/k/a Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, and William Cook Europe APS. (Rizkalla, Ruth)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant William Cook Europe APS. (lc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Cook Medical LLC. (lc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Cook Incorporated. (lc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Cook Group, Inc. (lc)
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Resubmitted Summons Request, (4 summons) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Please be advised case is No Longer before Case Opening Section. The Official case number is to include both assigned Judge and Magistrate's initials and is to read as: 2:22-cv-876 ODW(Ex) (see Notice of Assignment docket no. 3). Since summons request is a clerk's process, clerk will assist this time only re missing initials and process summons by separate entry. Therefore, NO Response to this notice is required. (lc)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Reynauld Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Cook Incorporated, #2 Summons - Cook Medical LLC, #3 Summons - William Cook Europe APS)(Rizkalla, Ruth)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Reynauld Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Summons - William Cook Europe APS, #2 Summons - Cook Group Inc, #3 Summons - Cook Incorporated)(Rizkalla, Ruth)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32757647 - Fee: $402. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Ruth Rizkalla added to party Reynauld Hampton(pty:pla))(Rizkalla, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynauld Hampton v. Cook Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynauld Hampton
Represented By: Ruth Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC f/k/a Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?