Samuel Zapata, III v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Zapata, III
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv00968
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 26 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES #15 held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion #15 was issued on February 3, 2023 #25 . Court and counsel confer. The Tentative Ruling is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Motion. Plaintiff is awarded $40,160.00 in attorneys' fees and $2,398.90 in costs and expenses. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (lom)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - TENTATIVE RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES #15 by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Court's Tentative Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion #15 set for hearing on February 6, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. (bm)
February 2, 2023 Filing 24 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Due to the expiration of the CARES ACT in the Central District of California, the Motion Hearing #15 , set for Monday, February 6, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. will be held in-person and not by telephone. Masks are required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 26, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. The parties are set to return on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses #15 , on February 6, 2023. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco)
January 24, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas A Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Douglas A Proudfoot added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Douglas)
January 24, 2023 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 01/26/2023 order to show cause re settlement hearing at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 23, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #15 filed by Plaintiff Samuel Zapata, III. (Jacobson, Kevin)
January 19, 2023 Filing 19 REQUEST for Leave of Gregory Sogoyan, Esq. to Appear for Remote Appearance filed by plaintiff Samuel Zapata, III. Request set for hearing on 1/26/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Appear Remotely) (Jacobson, Kevin)
January 19, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Y Jacobson counsel for Plaintiff Samuel Zapata, III. Adding Aaron Cohen, Esq. as counsel of record for SAMUEL ZAPATA III for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff SAMUEL ZAPATA III. (Jacobson, Kevin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 17 Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #15 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of opposition to plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
January 6, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES #15 does not comply with Local Rule 6. For that reason, Plaintiff's Motion previously scheduled for 01/26/2023 is continued to 2/6/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 5, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by plaintiff Samuel Zapata, III. Motion set for hearing on 1/26/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of Gregory Sogoyan, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Declaration of Kevin Jacobson, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7) (Jacobson, Kevin)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu. A Joint Notice of Settlement was filed on October 26, 2022. The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that a dismissal will be filed within 90 days. The Court now sets an order to show re: settlement hearing for January 26, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. The hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by noon on January 25, 2023. (aco)
October 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge George H. Wu:The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket No. 11) and finds it can set the schedule in this matter without hearing further statements from the parties. As per C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15, the March 24, 2022 scheduling conference date is taken off calendar. The Court sets the following dates: (see document for further details) (bm)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Samuel Zapata, III.. (Cohen, Aaron)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for March 24, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than March 17, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. (bm)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU: 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (see document for further details) (bm)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Proudfoot, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22STCV01514 Receipt No: ACACDC-32780098 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 02/09/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 11, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Samuel Zapata, III. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel Zapata, III v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Zapata, III
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Represented By: Kevin Y Jacobson
Represented By: Aaron Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Represented By: Douglas A Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?