Al Otro Lado, Inc. v. US Customs and Border Protection et al
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc. and Al Otro Lado
Defendant: US Customs and Border Protection, US IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2022cv01450
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Derek Ha on behalf of Plaintiff Al Otro Lado (Attorney Derek Ha added to party Al Otro Lado(pty:pla))(Ha, Derek)
March 10, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Andrew Dykens on behalf of Plaintiff Al Otro Lado. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney David L. Dubrow on behalf of Plaintiff Al Otro Lado. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Dykens. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David L. Dubrow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (lh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (lh)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint #1 , #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint [1-1], #3 Civil Cover Sheet #2 , #4 Certificate of Interested Parties #3 )(Hewlett, Douglas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint #1 , #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint [1-1], #3 Civil Cover Sheet #2 , #4 Certificate of Interested Parties #3 )(Hewlett, Douglas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc., (Hewlett, Douglas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Hewlett, Douglas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32886850 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original FOIA Request) (Attorney Douglas Eugene Hewlett, Jr added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hewlett, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Otro Lado, Inc. v. US Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Eugene Hewlett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado
Represented By: Douglas Eugene Hewlett, Jr
Represented By: Derek Ha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?