Casa Libre Freedom House et al v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Casa Libre/Freedom House, El Rescate Legal Services Inc, LAITY UNITED FOR ECONOMIC JUSTICE, SALVADORAN AMERICAN LEADERSHIP & EDUCATIONAL FUND, Central American Resource Center, LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, INC, Rene Gabriel FLORES MERINO, HILDNER EDUARDO CORONADO AJTUN, CARLOS ABEL HERNANDEZ AREVALO, AXEL YAFETH MAYORGA AGUILERA, RENE ISAI SERRANO MONTES, PAMELA ALEJANDRA RIVERA CAMBARA, Casa Libre Freedom House, El Rescate, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund and La Raza Centro Legal, Inc.
Defendant: Alejandro N Mayorkas, Director UR M JADDOU, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service
Case Number: 2:2022cv01510
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. Corrected Exhibit A - Declaration of Peter Schey as to Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #37 . (Schey, Peter)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting motion to certify class, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A in support of motion to certify class, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 in support of motion to certify class, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 in support of motion to certify class, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 in support of motion to certify class, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 in support of motion to certify class, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 in support of motion to certify class, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 in support of motion to certify class, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 in support of motion to certify class, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 in support of motion to certify class, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 in support of motion to certify class, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 in support of motion to certify class, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 in support of motion to certify class, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 in support of motion to certify class, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 in support of motion to certify class) (Schey, Peter)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Order STRIKING Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #35 and SETTING Parameters for Re-Filing. Plaintiffs shall file their renewed motion at least thirty-five (35) days before their selected hearing date. Plaintiffs shall include with their renewed motion a detailed, fact-specific declaration of counsel describing counsels efforts to comply with Local Rule 7-3. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFICS AS OBSERVED BY THE COURT). (lc)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (STRICKEN PER 4/26/2022 MINUTES ORDER DOCKET NO. 36). NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting class certification) (Schey, Peter) Modified on 4/27/2022 (lc).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Rene Isai Serrano Montes, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, El Rescate, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Casa Libre Freedom House, Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Central American Resource Center(Schey, Peter)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Genevieve E. Augustin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Monte and designating Peter A. Schey as local counsel #28 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jim Tom Haynes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes and designating Peter Schey as local counsel #31 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jim Tom Haynes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996791) filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting application for admission pro hac vice) (Schey, Peter)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Tate Chambers on behalf of Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service (Attorney Sarah Tate Chambers added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Tate Chambers added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Tate Chambers added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service(pty:dft))(Chambers, Sarah)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez counsel for Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service. Adding Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez as counsel of record for Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and immigration Services for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service(pty:dft))(Masetta-Alvarez, Katelyn)
March 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Genevieve E. Augustin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32976952) filed by Plaintiffs Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting application for admission pro hac vice) (Schey, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Rene Isai Serrano Montes, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, El Rescate, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Casa Libre Freedom House, Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Central American Resource Center, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk per www.justice.gov/usao/cddca. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to US Citizenship and Immigration Service. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Schey, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Rene Isai Serrano Montes, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, El Rescate, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Casa Libre Freedom House, Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Central American Resource Center, upon Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service served on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk (per https://www.justice.gov/usao-cdca). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Schey, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Rene Isai Serrano Montes, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, El Rescate, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Casa Libre Freedom House, Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Central American Resource Center, upon Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas served on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk (per https://www.justice.gov/usao-cdca). Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Schey, Peter)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Order STRIKING Improper Filing #20 ; SPECIAL NOTICE to All Attorneys re: Local Rules, Litigation Expectations, and Sanctions. On March 15, 2022, Attorney Genevieve Augustin, who seeks to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, filed a Response to the Court's Notice of Filing Fee Due. The Response is improper in surprising ways, such that the Court finds it necessary to take pause and remind all counsel in this matter of the Court's litigation expectations (SEE DOCUMENT FOR COURT'S SPECIFIC REASONS AS DISCUSSED HEREIN). For these reasons, the Court STRIKES the improper Response. the Court issues this NOTICE to all counsel. All counsel are expected to be familiar with the Local Rules for the Central District of California, this Courtroom's rules1, and any case management orders to be issued in this case. Moreover, pro hac vice attorneys must be familiar with the local customs and practices of this Court, consulting with local counsel of record to fulfill this requirement as necessary. Counsel for all parties should work together and coordinate their filings and actions as necessary so that the record of this case remains clean and organized. (lc)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney CARL BERGQUIST to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes and designating Peter A. Schey as local counsel #18 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney CARL BERGQUIST to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescat #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The out-of-state attorneys in Jim Tom Haynes, Genevieve Augustin, and Fausto Falzone, deadlines to file applications for admission pro hac vice or complete the form GF-109 and return it to the court are extended to March 24, 2022. (lc) Modified on 3/15/2022 (lc).
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (STRICKEN PER 3/16/2022 MINUTES DOCKET NO. 24).RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Genevieve Augustin on behalf of Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, et al. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. The MD bar does not give good standing certificates instantly or online. The applicant seeks an extension. (lt) Modified on 3/16/2022 (lc).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File applications for admission pro hac vice filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order extending time to file pro hac vice applications) (Schey, Peter)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney CARL BERGQUIST to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32945414) filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre Freedom House, Central American Resource Center, Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice, Hildner Eduardo Coronado Ajtun, El Rescate, Rene Gabriel Flores Merino, Carlos Abel Hernandez Arevalo, La Raza Centro Legal, Inc., Axel Yafeth Mayorga Aguilera, Pamela Alejandra Rivera Cambara, Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund, Rene Isai Serrano Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting admission pro hac vice) (Schey, Peter)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who havepending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carl Bergquist. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Fausto Falzone. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Genevieve Augustin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jim Tom Haynes. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ur M. Jaddou. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre/Freedom House, HILDNER EDUARDO CORONADO AJTUN, Central American Resource Center, El Rescate Legal Services Inc, Rene Gabriel FLORES MERINO, CARLOS ABEL HERNANDEZ AREVALO, LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, INC, LAITY UNITED FOR ECONOMIC JUSTICE, AXEL YAFETH MAYORGA AGUILERA, PAMELA ALEJANDRA RIVERA CAMBARA, SALVADORAN AMERICAN LEADERSHIP & EDUCATIONAL FUND, RENE ISAI SERRANO MONTES. (Schey, Peter)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre/Freedom House, HILDNER EDUARDO CORONADO AJTUN, Central American Resource Center, El Rescate Legal Services Inc, Rene Gabriel FLORES MERINO, CARLOS ABEL HERNANDEZ AREVALO, LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, INC, LAITY UNITED FOR ECONOMIC JUSTICE, AXEL YAFETH MAYORGA AGUILERA, PAMELA ALEJANDRA RIVERA CAMBARA, SALVADORAN AMERICAN LEADERSHIP & EDUCATIONAL FUND, RENE ISAI SERRANO MONTES. (Schey, Peter)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Casa Libre/Freedom House, HILDNER EDUARDO CORONADO AJTUN, Central American Resource Center, El Rescate Legal Services Inc, Rene Gabriel FLORES MERINO, CARLOS ABEL HERNANDEZ AREVALO, LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, INC, LAITY UNITED FOR ECONOMIC JUSTICE, AXEL YAFETH MAYORGA AGUILERA, PAMELA ALEJANDRA RIVERA CAMBARA, SALVADORAN AMERICAN LEADERSHIP & EDUCATIONAL FUND, RENE ISAI SERRANO MONTES. (Schey, Peter)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiffs' CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party HILDNER EDUARDO CORONADO AJTUN(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Central American Resource Center(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party El Rescate Legal Services Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Rene Gabriel FLORES MERINO(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party CARLOS ABEL HERNANDEZ AREVALO(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, INC(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party LAITY UNITED FOR ECONOMIC JUSTICE (pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party AXEL YAFETH MAYORGA AGUILERA(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party PAMELA ALEJANDRA RIVERA CAMBARA(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party SALVADORAN AMERICAN LEADERSHIP & EDUCATIONAL FUND (pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party RENE ISAI SERRANO MONTES(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Casa Libre/Freedom House. (Schey, Peter)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32899377 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Casa Libre/Freedom House. (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Casa Libre/Freedom House(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casa Libre Freedom House et al v. Alejandro Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casa Libre/Freedom House
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Rescate Legal Services Inc
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAITY UNITED FOR ECONOMIC JUSTICE
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALVADORAN AMERICAN LEADERSHIP & EDUCATIONAL FUND
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central American Resource Center
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, INC
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Gabriel FLORES MERINO
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILDNER EDUARDO CORONADO AJTUN
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS ABEL HERNANDEZ AREVALO
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXEL YAFETH MAYORGA AGUILERA
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE ISAI SERRANO MONTES
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA ALEJANDRA RIVERA CAMBARA
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casa Libre Freedom House
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Rescate
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clergy and Laity United for Economic Justice
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvadoran American Leadership And Educational Fund
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Raza Centro Legal, Inc.
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Represented By: Alex Holguin
Represented By: Camila Lucero Alvarez
Represented By: Carl J. Bergquist
Represented By: Claudia Quintana
Represented By: Cristel Stefany Martinez
Represented By: Cynthia Julieta Henning
Represented By: Daniel Bral
Represented By: Genevieve Augustin
Represented By: Jim Tom Haynes
Represented By: Lilit Melkonyan
Represented By: Marcos Pacheco
Represented By: Maritza Roxana Agundez
Represented By: Ruth Natalie Calvillo
Represented By: Silvia Aguirre
Represented By: Stephany Gisel Arzaga
Represented By: Stephen A Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director UR M JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Represented By: Sarah Tate Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Represented By: Sarah Tate Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service
Represented By: Katelyn Masetta-Alvarez
Represented By: Sarah Tate Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?