Kayla Blacksher v. SafeMoon LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kayla Blacksher
Defendant: SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon US, LLC, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, Tano LLC, SafeMoon LTD, SafeMoon Protocol LTD, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, Braden John Karony, Jack Haines-Davies, Ryan Arriaga, Shaun Witriol, Henry Wyatt, Thomas Smith, Kyle Nagy, Jake Paul, Nick Carter, DeAndre Cortez Way, Ben Phillips, Miles Parks McCollum, Daniel M. Keem and Henry "Hank&quot Wyatt
Petitioner: Safemoon Investor Group and Christopher Rackauckas
Case Number: 2:2022cv01527
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
3 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 80 REQUEST For A Zoom Appearance for Hearing on Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by defendant Shaun Witriol. (rolm)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOVANT THE SAFEMOON INVESTORS GROUP FOR: (1) CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS; (2) APPOINTMENT AS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS FOR SECURITIES CLAIMS; (3) APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR SECURITIES CLAIMS; (4) APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR NON-SECURITIES CLAIMS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court orders these cases consolidated, with 2:22-cv-01108-SVW-MRW as the lead case. Case 2:22-cv-01527-SVW-MRW is administratively closed and moved to the inactive calendar. All future filings shall be made in the lead case. Plaintiffs shall designate an existing complaint as the operative complaint or file an amended complaint within 21 days.; granting #38 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel ; granting #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #38 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group; and #41 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas: The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 7, 2022 Filing 77 REQUEST for Leave of John Jasnoch to Appear for Zoom Appearance re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, 38, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff 41 filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant The Safemoon Investor Group Safemoon Investor Group. Request set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Jasnoch, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 76 REQUEST FOR A ZOOM APPEARANCE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #41 filed by Defendants Thomas Smith, Henry "Hank" Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marder, Neal)
June 6, 2022 Filing 75 REQUEST FOR A ZOOM APPEARANCE filed by Defendant Jake Paul re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #41 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Silver, Levi)
June 6, 2022 Filing 74 REQUEST FOR A ZOOM APPEARANCE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #41 filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mena, Claire)
June 3, 2022 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Claire Elise Mena counsel for Defendant Kyle Nagy. Adding Claire Mena as counsel of record for Kyle Nagy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attorney Claire Elise Mena added to party Kyle Nagy(pty:dft))(Mena, Claire)
May 23, 2022 Filing 72 STIPULATION for Order Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Approving Co-Lead Counsel filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John)
May 23, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Kahn on behalf of Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC (Kahn, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jacob Usher Arber on behalf of Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC (Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party Braden John Karony(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon Connect, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon Media Group LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Usher Arber added to party SafeMoon US, LLC(pty:dft))(Arber, Jacob)
May 23, 2022 Filing 69 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Motions for Consolidation of Related Actions NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC. (Collins, Paul)
May 23, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul J Collins on behalf of Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC (Collins, Paul)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #60 Non-Resident Attorney Devin Freedman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Rackauckas, designating Ivy T. Ngo as local counsel. (lom)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #56 #65 Non-Resident Attorney Edward Normand APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Rackauckas, designating Ivy T. Ngo as local counsel. (lom)
May 19, 2022 Filing 65 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward Normand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/11/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33277706) filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ngo, Ivy)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Rackauckas, designating Ivy T. Ngo as local counsel. granting #57 Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Lagos (rolm)
May 19, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward Normand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33277706) #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incorrect on proposed order. Application is for Edward Normand, but proposed order has name of Kyle Roche but has Edward Normand's email address listed. (lt)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Rackauckas, designating Ivy T. Ngo as local counsel. granting #55 Non-Resident Attorney Kyle W. Roche (rolm)
May 19, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33323445) #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: PHV counsel failed to sign the application. Staff or someone other than attorney signed. The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section I of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). (lt)
May 18, 2022 Filing 60 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33323445) filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - FL, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - NY) (Ngo, Ivy)
May 13, 2022 Filing 59 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jake Paul answer now due 6/15/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Jake Paul. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Levi)
May 13, 2022 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Levi Y Silver counsel for Defendant Jake Paul. Adding Levi Y. Silver as counsel of record for Jake Paul for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Jake Paul. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Levi Y Silver added to party Jake Paul(pty:dft))(Silver, Levi)
May 11, 2022 Filing 57 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Lagos to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33281491) filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ngo, Ivy)
May 11, 2022 Filing 56 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward Normand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33277706) filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ngo, Ivy)
May 11, 2022 Filing 55 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyle W. Roche to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Christopher Rackauckas (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33277566) filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ngo, Ivy)
May 11, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eitan Kimelman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
May 11, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peretz Bronstein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
May 11, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Lagos. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
May 11, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward Normand. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
May 11, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Vel Freedman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
May 11, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kyle W. Roche. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
May 10, 2022 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #47 Upon Defendant Shaun Witriol, served on May 10, 2022. (Jasnoch, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group, (Jasnoch, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas, (Ngo, Ivy)
May 10, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 10, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 10, 2022 Filing 43 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group, re Memorandum in Support of Motion, #39 , Declaration (Motion related),, #40 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 Upon Defendant Shaun Witriol, served on May 10, 2022. (Jasnoch, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Kyle W. Roche in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff #41 filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Firm Resume)(Ngo, Ivy)
May 9, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Christopher Rackauckas. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ivy T Ngo added to party Christopher Rackauckas(pty:mov)) (Ngo, Ivy)
May 9, 2022 Filing 40 DECLARATION of John T. Jasnoch In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 filed by Movant Safemoon Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Movants Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Movants Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration of Movants, #5 Exhibit E - Scott+Scott Firm Resume)(Jasnoch, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, #38 filed by Movant Safemoon Investor Group. (Jasnoch, John)
May 9, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel , Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:22-cv-01108, and 2:22-cv-01527, filed by Lead Plaintiff Movant Safemoon Investor Group. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Safemoon Investor Group(pty:bkmov)) (Jasnoch, John)
May 3, 2022 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Date Approved by Court Following Submission of Proposed Schedule for Response to Operative Complaint Following Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Defendants and Lead Plaintiff Submitting Proposed Schedule to Court filed by Defendants Braden John Karony, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Linda D. Lam ISO Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint, #3 Declaration Proof of Service by Mail Certification/Declaration)(Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party Braden John Karony(pty:dft), Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon Connect, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon Media Group LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Linda Diep Lam added to party SafeMoon US, LLC(pty:dft))(Lam, Linda)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having considered Plaintiffs response, the Court declines to consolidate cases 2:22-cv-01527 and 2:22-cv-01108 at this time, prior to the selection of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel in the federal securities case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2022 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher, re Response #33 served on April 15, 2022. (Jasnoch, John)
April 13, 2022 Filing 34 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Miles Parks McCollum answer now due 5/11/2022, filed by Defendant Miles Parks McCollum.(Attorney Matthew Devin Barzman added to party Miles Parks McCollum(pty:dft))(Barzman, Matthew)
April 12, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksherto Text Only Scheduling Notice, 27 re Order to Show Cause (Jasnoch, John)
April 8, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henry "Hank" Wyatt answer now due 5/11/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Henry "Hank" Wyatt.(Altman, Peter)
April 8, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas Smith answer now due 5/11/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Thomas Smith.(Altman, Peter)
April 8, 2022 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neal R Marder counsel for Defendants Thomas Smith, Henry "Hank" Wyatt. Adding Neal R. Marder as counsel of record for Thomas Smith and Henry "Hank" Wyatt for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Thomas Smith and Henry "Hank" Wyatt. (Attorney Neal R Marder added to party Thomas Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Neal R Marder added to party Henry "Hank" Wyatt(pty:dft))(Marder, Neal)
April 8, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter Ian Altman counsel for Defendants Thomas Smith, Henry "Hank" Wyatt. Adding Peter I. Altman as counsel of record for Thomas Smith and Henry "Hank" Wyatt for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Thomas Smith and Henry "Hank" Wyatt. (Attorney Peter Ian Altman added to party Thomas Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ian Altman added to party Henry "Hank" Wyatt(pty:dft))(Altman, Peter)
April 8, 2022 Filing 28 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Daniel M. Keem answer now due 5/10/2022, filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher.(Jasnoch, John)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having reviewed the complaints in each matter, Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause within seven (7) days why this case should not be consolidated with the case at 2:22-cv-01108-SVW-MRW. Plaintiffs response shall not exceed eight (8) pages. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 31, 2022 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher, upon Defendant Henry "Hank" Wyatt served on 3/20/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Henry Wyatt, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
March 31, 2022 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher, upon Defendant Thomas Smith served on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heather Cunningham, Co-occupant/ Cousin in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
March 31, 2022 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher, upon Defendant Miles Parks McCollum served on 3/20/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Venita McCollum, mother/ co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
March 31, 2022 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher, upon Defendant Daniel M. Keem served on 3/21/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelly Keem, Wife/Co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
March 30, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kyle Nagy answer now due 5/11/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy.(Bafus, Marie)
March 30, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marie Bafus counsel for Defendant Kyle Nagy. Adding Marie C. Bafus as counsel of record for Kyle Nagy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attorney Marie Bafus added to party Kyle Nagy(pty:dft))(Bafus, Marie)
March 30, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael S Dicke counsel for Defendant Kyle Nagy. Adding Michael S. Dicke as counsel of record for Kyle Nagy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kyle Nagy. (Attorney Michael S Dicke added to party Kyle Nagy(pty:dft))(Dicke, Michael)
March 21, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon Jake Paul waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/16/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Levi Y. Silver. (Jasnoch, John)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-01108-SVW (MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01527-SVW (MRWx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (et)
March 15, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon Braden John Karony waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Linda D. Lam. (Jasnoch, John)
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon SafeMoon LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Linda D. Lam. (Jasnoch, John)
March 15, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon Nick Carter waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Michael Holtz. (Jasnoch, John)
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon SafeMoon US, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Linda D. Lam. (Jasnoch, John)
March 10, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon SafeMoon Media Group LTD waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Linda D. Lam. (Jasnoch, John)
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. upon SafeMoon Connect, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Linda D. Lam. (Jasnoch, John)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Ryan Arriaga, Nick Carter, Jack Haines-Davies, Braden John Karony, Daniel M. Keem, Miles Parks McCollum, Kyle Nagy, Jake Paul, Ben Phillips, SafeMoon Connect, LLC, SafeMoon LLC, SafeMoon LTD, SafeMoon Media Group LTD, SafeMoon Protocol LTD, SafeMoon US, LLC, Thomas Smith, Tano LLC, DeAndre Cortez Way, Shaun Witriol, Henry "Hank" Wyatt. (rolm)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (rolm)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher, (Jasnoch, John)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of John T. Jasnoch re: Proper Venue Pursuant to Cal. Civil Code 1780(d) filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. (Jasnoch, John)
March 7, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. (Jasnoch, John)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. (Jasnoch, John)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32905041 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kayla Blacksher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws) (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Kayla Blacksher(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayla Blacksher v. SafeMoon LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Blacksher
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon LLC
Represented By: Linda Diep Lam
Represented By: Michael J Kahn
Represented By: Paul J Collins
Represented By: Jacob Usher Arber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon US, LLC
Represented By: Linda Diep Lam
Represented By: Michael J Kahn
Represented By: Paul J Collins
Represented By: Jacob Usher Arber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon Connect, LLC
Represented By: Linda Diep Lam
Represented By: Michael J Kahn
Represented By: Paul J Collins
Represented By: Jacob Usher Arber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tano LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon Protocol LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeMoon Media Group LTD
Represented By: Linda Diep Lam
Represented By: Michael J Kahn
Represented By: Paul J Collins
Represented By: Jacob Usher Arber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braden John Karony
Represented By: Linda Diep Lam
Represented By: Michael J Kahn
Represented By: Paul J Collins
Represented By: Jacob Usher Arber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Haines-Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Witriol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Smith
Represented By: Neal R Marder
Represented By: Peter Ian Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Nagy
Represented By: Marie Bafus
Represented By: Michael S Dicke
Represented By: Claire Elise Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Paul
Represented By: Levi Y Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAndre Cortez Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Parks McCollum
Represented By: Lawrence C Hinkle, II
Represented By: Matthew Devin Barzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Keem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry "Hank&quot Wyatt
Represented By: Neal R Marder
Represented By: Peter Ian Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Safemoon Investor Group
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Rackauckas
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: Devin Freedman
Represented By: Edward Normand
Represented By: Kyle William Roche
Represented By: Stephen Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?