Kecia M. Simmons v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Kecia Simmons and Kecia M. Simmons
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Airport Marina Ford and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv01593
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO RESOLVE COSTS AND EXPENSES & REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT #37 by Judge John F. Walter. The court has considered the parties' Joint Stipulation to Resolve Fees, Costs and Expenses, and hereby enters judgment in the amount of $41,000, payable to Plaintiff's counsel, Strategic Legal Practices, APC., within 60 days. (iv)
February 9, 2023 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION for Attorney Fees in the amount of $41,000 filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Notice of Appearance)(Rabieian, Debora)
February 8, 2023 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zavig Mkrdech counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Zavig Mkrdech as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Zavig Mkrdech added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Mkrdech, Zavig)
February 3, 2023 Filing 35 STATEMENT JOINT STATEMENT FOLLOWING LOCAL RULE 7-3 MEET AND CONFER CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons (Dolin, Tionna)
January 26, 2023 Filing 34 JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter. The Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
January 24, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Rabieian, Debora)
January 24, 2023 Filing 32 REQUEST for Order for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the rule 68 filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Debora Rabieian added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla)) (Rabieian, Debora)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT FOR MOTOR COMPANY'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF FED. R. CIV. P. 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT [filed 1/18/23; Docket No. #30 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The parties are ordered to file a proposed Judgment in this action no later than January 25, 2023. (iv)
January 18, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jun, Patricia)
January 10, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Steven Whang is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 27, 2022 Filing 28 STATEMENT LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE REGARDING FORDS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Jun, Patricia)
December 27, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Kecia M. Simmons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
December 22, 2022 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Michael D. Mortenson As Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
December 22, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Jun, Patricia)
December 9, 2022 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT on Alternative Dispute Resolution Status - Joint filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Whang, Steven)
December 1, 2022 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dolin, Tionna)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Withdrawal of Amended Complaint/Petition #21 filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 **WITHDRAWN** First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Airport Marina Ford, Does, Ford Motor Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons(Whang, Steven) Modified on 12/2/2022 Per Notice #22 (iv).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #19 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant shall have 21 days from the date of filing to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (iv)
November 10, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Leave to Amend for Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Attorney Steven Whang added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
November 10, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Whang counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Steven D. Whang as counsel of record for Kecia M. Simmons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Steven Whang added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
October 5, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Joy De Leon as counsel of record for Kecia M. Simmons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(De Leon, Joy)
August 18, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mani Arabi counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Mani Arabi as counsel of record for Kecia M. Simmons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Mani Arabi added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Arabi, Mani)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Kecia M. Simmons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Kecia M. Simmon. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 3/17/2023 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on March 28, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 5, 2022. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 9, 2022. (iv)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons, (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Kecia M. Simmons for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Kecia M. Simmons(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for March 28, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before March 17, 2022. (iv)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
March 9, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Airport Marina Ford, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
March 9, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/9/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3)(ghap)
March 9, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Airport Marina Ford without prejudice filed by plaintiff Kecia M. Simmons. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/7/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 4) (ghap)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Mortenson, Michael)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV25935 Receipt No: ACACDC-32922271 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Declaration 6 to Decl. of M. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party Ford Motor Company (pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kecia M. Simmons v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kecia Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kecia M. Simmons
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Debora Rabieian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airport Marina Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?