Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez v. United States Department of State
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez
Defendant: United States Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizen and Immigration Service
Case Number: 2:2022cv01643
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Margo A Rocconi
3 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Attorney for Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez, upon Defendant United States Citizen and Immigration Service served on 3/17/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk pursuant to U.S. Attorney's Office for the Central District of California website at https://www.justice.gov/usao-cdca. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of the Chief Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Schey, Peter)
March 19, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff's attorney Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/17/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil process clerk per U.S. Attorney's Office for the Central District of California website at https://www.justice.gov/usao-cdca).. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of General Counsel, US Department of Homeland Security. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Schey, Peter)
March 19, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez, upon Defendant United States Department of State served on 3/17/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk pursuant to U.S. Attorney's Office for the Central District of California website at https://www.justice.gov/usao-cdca).. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to he Executive Office,Office of the Legal Advisor. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Schey, Peter)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-01643-SVW (RAOx). (et)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Department of State. (ghap)
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap)
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Citizen and Immigration Service. (ghap)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap)
March 12, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez. (Schey, Peter)
March 12, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez. (Schey, Peter)
March 12, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez. (Schey, Peter)
March 12, 2022 Filing 3 Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez, (Schey, Peter)
March 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez. (Schey, Peter)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32936362 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez. (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez v. United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Carvajal Ramirez
Represented By: Peter A Schey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizen and Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?