Maha Elregragui Moqaddem v. Albert Gregory Pinto et al.
Plaintiff: Maha MOQADDEM and Maha Elregragui Moqaddem
Defendant: Albert G Pinto, Albert Gregory Pinto and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 2:2022cv01808
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2022 Filing 40 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem, (Murphy, George)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND, AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Because the Court is satisfied of its subject matter jurisdiction, the Court's 3/24/2022 Order to Show Cause regarding subject matter jurisdiction #11 is DISCHARGED. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand ("MTR") #31 is DENIED as moot. The 5/20/2022 hearing on the MTR is VACATED. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) ("MTD") #12 is unopposed. The MTD is therefore GRANTED, with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by no later than 5/19/2022. The 5/20/2022 hearing on the MTD is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Court's Case Management Order: Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand filed 4/26/2022 #37 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 6-1. (gk)
April 26, 2022 Filing 37 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 4/27/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. 38] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Monica Courthouse #31 EXHIBITS M DECLARATION OF GEORGE E MUROHY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND filed by PLAINTIFF AMENDED MOTION AND MOTION TO REMAND Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A), #2 Exhibit (B), #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF GEORGE MURPHY SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND, #4 Supplement CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES) (Murphy, George) Modified on 4/27/2022 (gk).
April 26, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. correcting First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Monica Courthouse #31 NOTICE OF ERRATA BY PLAINTIFF 'S ATTORNEY (Murphy, George)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Court's Case Management Order: Plaintiff's Opposition filed 4/18/2022 #30 , for the following reasons: Rule 11(a). (gk)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S DISQUALIFICATION MOTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to show that this Court's impartiality might reasonably be questioned. Accordingly, Plaintiff's disqualification motion #29 is DENIED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. In light of Plaintiff's late-filed opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ("MTD") #12 , the hearing on Defendants MTD is continued to May 20, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants Reply, if any, shall be filed by May 6, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 21, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Monica Courthouse #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 18, 2022 Filing 31 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Monica Courthouse filed by Maha ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Murphy, George)
April 18, 2022 Filing 30 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 4/25/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. 35] OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. (Murphy, George) Modified on 4/25/2022 (gk).
April 18, 2022 Filing 29 First REQUEST to Disqualify Judge HOLLY M GEE BY PLAINTIFF filed by Maha ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. (Attachments: #1 Signed Application MOTION- DISQUALIFICATION OF HON JUDGE DOLLY GEE, #2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF MAHA EL MOQADDEM) (Murphy, George)
April 7, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE -PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICAL OFFICER (C.C.C., 170.6) filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (C.C.P., 170.6) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (C.C.P., 170.6))(Murphy, George)
April 7, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE MAHA ELMOQADDEM DECLARATION FOR IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE filed by Maha ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. Exhibits for Declaration of Maha El Moqaddem for Improper Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a- Statement of Declaration by Albert Pinto of PERJURY, #2 Exhibit b- Maha Elmoqaddem executed Annulment to annul any marriage certificate obtained by error by Albert Pinto, #3 Exhibit c- 02/08/2022 Court Transcripts Statements made by Albert Pinto evidencing his faire to file Verified Statements in his Los Angeles State Pending Case, #4 Exhibit d- Albert Pinto listing himself as an Executive Vice President at AVO SOLUTIONS located in Canoga Park, CA, #5 Exhibit e- Updated print out from Pending State Case of Albert Pinto evidencing no filing of verified statement by Pinto since 02/08/2022 to this date)(Murphy, George)
April 7, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. correcting Notice (Other),,, #25 Exhibit(b) was not attached to Exhibit from computer error (Murphy, George)
April 7, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE DECLARATION OF MAHA VISCONTI FOR IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN DOCEKT NO.24 filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. EXHBITS FOR MAHA EL MOQADDEM'S DECLARATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (a) Statement of Declaration by Albert Pinto of PERJURY, #2 Exhibit (b) Maha Elmoqaddem executed Annulment to annul any marriage certificate obtained by error by Albert Pinto, #3 Exhibit (c) 02/08/2022 Court Transcripts Statements made by Albert Pinto evidencing his faire to file Verified Statements in his Los Angeles State Pending Case, #4 Exhibit (d) Albert Pinto listing himself as an Executive Vice President at AVO SOLUTIONS located in Canoga Park, CA, #5 Exhibit (e) Updated print out from Pending State Case of Albert Pinto evidencing no filing of verified statement by Pinto since 02/08/2022 to this date)(Murphy, George)
April 6, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE (Amended) PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR IMPROPER FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. EXHIBITS OF EVIDENCE IN (Amended) PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FOR IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Murphy, George)
April 6, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. correcting Notice (Other),, #20 TO CORRECT EXHIBITS TO BE PROPERLY DOWNLOADED (Murphy, George)
April 6, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE (amended) DECLARATION OF GOERGE E MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. (Amended) Exhibits for Declaration of George E Murphy in support of Amended Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Murphy, George)
April 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE DECLARATIOn OF GEORGE MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF AMEDED PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. EXHIBITS IN UPPORT OF DECLARATION OF GEORGE E MURPHY FOR IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Murphy, George)
April 5, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE AMENDED - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY ALBERT GREGORY PINTO filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED- PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Murphy, George)
April 5, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF IMPROPER NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY ALBERT PINTO filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. EXHIBITS FOR PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Murphy, George)
April 4, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Defendant Albert Gregory Pinto re Request for Judicial Notice,,,, #13 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition, #17 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #11 filed by Defendant Albert Gregory Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proof of Service re Summons dated 03/18/22)(Nguyen, Lan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Albert Gregory Pinto. in response to Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Judicial Notice,,,, #13 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #11 (Nguyen, Lan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss For failure to State a Claim (FRCP 12(b)(6)) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
March 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE URGENT ADDITIONAL DECLARATION TO DISTRICT COURT filed by MAHA ELREGRAGUI MOQADDEM Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. GEORGE E MURPHY (Attachments: #1 Declaration URGENT ADDITIONAL DECLARATION NOTICE TO DISTRICT COURT AND NOTICE)(Murphy, George)
March 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE Defendants Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Defendant Albert Gregory Pinto. (Nguyen, Lan)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss For failure to State a Claim (FRCP 12(b)(6)) #12 filed by Defendant Albert Gregory Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Criminal Case Summary SA098438, #2 Exhibit Prelim Hearing SA098438, #3 Exhibit Plea Hearing BA449560, #4 Exhibit Probation Calendar BA449560, #5 Exhibit Criminal Case Summary SA104487, #6 Exhibit Motion re Revocation Probation BA449560, #7 Exhibit CalBar Search Results, #8 Exhibit CA Marriage Cert, #9 Exhibit NV Complaint for Annulment, #10 Exhibit NV Annulment Decree, #11 Exhibit DMV Range Rover Docs, #12 Exhibit Complaint 21STCV225467, #13 Exhibit Criminal Protective Order July 2018 SA098438, #14 Exhibit Criminal Protective Order May 2021 SA104487, #15 Exhibit Police Incident Report July 11, 2012, #16 Exhibit Police Incident Report May 11, 2021, #17 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Order re Vexatious Litigant, #18 Exhibit Family Court Case Summary BD451399)(Nguyen, Lan)
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss For failure to State a Claim (FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed by DEFENDANT Albert Gregory Pinto. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Nguyen, Lan)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Pinto is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Pinto shall file a response by no later than 4/5/2022. Failure to timely file a satisfactory response by this deadline will result in the remand of this action to state court. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (sh)
March 20, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE URGENT DECLARATION CASE 22SMCV00233 IS A STATE CASE NOT IN DISTRICT COURT filed by PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY IN STATE COURT Maha MOQADDEM. URGENT DECLARATION AND NOTICE TO DISTRICT COURT (Murphy, George)
March 18, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Albert Gregory Pinto. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Maha Elregragui Moqaddem. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/18/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Albert G Pinto, re Jury Demand #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 and Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 03/18/2022. (Nguyen, Lan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Albert G Pinto.. (Nguyen, Lan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Albert G Pinto, identifying Maha Moqaddem. (Nguyen, Lan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Albert G Pinto. (Nguyen, Lan)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 22SMCV00233 Receipt No: ACACDC-32972300 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney Albert G Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit Court Docket 22SMCV00233) (Attorney Lan Nguyen added to party Albert G Pinto(pty:dft))(Nguyen, Lan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maha Elregragui Moqaddem v. Albert Gregory Pinto et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maha MOQADDEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maha Elregragui Moqaddem
Represented By: George Edward Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert G Pinto
Represented By: Lan Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gregory Pinto
Represented By: Lan Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?