Gayle Peevy v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gayle Peevy
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv02036
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
2 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher Campbell on behalf of Plaintiff Gayle Peevy (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 17, 2023 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Christine Haw is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 11, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; adding and terming the same attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 9, 2023 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 9, 2023 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Adding Christine J. Haw as counsel of record for Gayle Peevy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES #36 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2023 at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 5, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER RE DEFICIENCY by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Pursuant to the filing of Second Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates filed at Dkt. No(s). #36 . A WordPerfect or Microsoft Word copy of the proposed document along with a PDF copy of the electronically filed main document was to be emailed to Judge Garnetts generic chambers email address in compliance with L.R. 5-4.4.2. Counsel shall email the necessary documents by July 6, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 3, 2023 Filing 36 Second STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from Sept 12, 2023 to Feb 13, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON SECOND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. LAROCQUE IN SUPPORT OF SECOND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES)(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2023 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Filed by plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
December 22, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order SHALL NOT have counsel's name, address, and phone number in upper, left corner. See Judge's Procedure page at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-Sherilyn Peace Garnett for counsel to review the Proposed Order Sample. Counsel to re-submit Proposed Order in accordance to the Judge' posted sample. See Judge's signature line - NOT Superior Court. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) Modified on 12/22/2022 (lom).
December 21, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
December 21, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett, Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates #30 . Note: Changes added by the Court. ( Pretrial Conference continued to 8/30/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett., Trial continued to 9/12/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett.) (twdb)
December 19, 2022 Filing 30 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Continue Trial and Related Dates filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
September 29, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Gayle Peevy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
September 29, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Gayle Peevy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
August 26, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 26, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nejla Nassirian on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Nejla Nassirian added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Nassirian, Nejla)
August 26, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffery J Fadeff on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeffery J Fadeff added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Fadeff, Jeffery)
August 26, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret for Defendant FCA US LLC., in place and stead of Attorneys Leslie Natalie Morales and Richard L Stuhlbarg #22 . (jp)
August 24, 2022 Filing 22 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg / Leslie N. Morales Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-142) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Garnett, Sherilyn Peace, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02036-SPG-Ex. (aco)
June 16, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for March 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, April 4, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. (iv)
April 26, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying Gayle Peevy, FCA US, LLC, Stellantis, N.V. FCA Holdco B.V., FCA North America Holdings, LLC,. (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 6/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Gayle Peevy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 22, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Attorney Richard L Stuhlbarg added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Stuhlbarg, Richard)
April 18, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 31, 2022 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Gayle Peevy, identifying FCA US LLC. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Gayle Peevy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (et)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33018766 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Gayle Peevy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2016 Jeep Compass Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Gayle Peevy (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayle Peevy v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Peevy
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Leslie Natalie Morales
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Jeffery J Fadeff
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?