Kyle Hanagami v. Epic Games, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Hanagami
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv02063
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING APPEAL by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. In light of Plaintiff's notice of appeal, the case will be stayed pending resolution of the appeal. All hearings and deadlines are currently vacated, and disposition on motions will be deferred until resolution of the appeal. The parties shall notify the Court, in writing, when the case should be restored to the active calendar. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (aco)
September 27, 2022 Filing 48 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55890 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #46 as to plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (mat)
September 23, 2022 Filing 47 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #46 . (Boyd, Kathryn)
September 23, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #45 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34044014.) (Attachments: #1 Order at ECF 45)(Boyd, Kathryn)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTES ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS #30 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED.; granting #30 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc. #30 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 06/27/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 13, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
June 6, 2022 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami, re. Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to the Hecht Declaration served on June 6, 2022. (Hecht, David)
June 6, 2022 Filing 41 DECLARATION of David L. Hecht In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - It's Complicated Emote _ Fortnite Battle Royale Youtube Video, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fortnite Infringement of Kyle Hanagami Choreography Youtube Video)(Hecht, David)
June 6, 2022 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re. Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to the Hecht Declaration filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Hecht, David)
June 6, 2022 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Hecht, David)
June 6, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami of Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of David L. Hecht. (Hecht, David)
May 31, 2022 Filing 37 SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 - The motion is accepted as filed, with the hearing set for 6/27/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 27, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Judicial Notice #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: (Motions and Related Filings) Request for Judicial Notice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
May 27, 2022 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc., of Exhibits A and B to #33 Declaration of Dale M. Cendali served on May 27, 2022. (Cendali, Dale)
May 27, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc. of Video Exhibits. (Cendali, Dale)
May 27, 2022 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Dale M. Cendali in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Physical Exhibit - CHARLIE PUTH - How Long_Kyle Hanagami Choreography, #2 Exhibit B - Physical Exhibit - INGAME RECORDING - It's Complicated Emote, #3 Exhibit C - Makanani Photo and Nohe Artwork from Reece v Island Treasures Art Gallery, #4 Exhibit D - Redd v Epic Dkt. 35-7 - Copyright Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E - Redd v Epic Dkt. 35-7 - Copyright Office Public Catalog Entry, #6 Exhibit F - Ribeiro v Epic Dkt. 23-8 - Copyright Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - Ferguson v Epic Dkt. 59-3 - Copyright Correspondence, #8 Exhibit H - Pilobolus Letter)(Cendali, Dale)
May 27, 2022 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
May 27, 2022 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
May 27, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cendali, Dale)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Epic Games, Inc., designating Yungmoon Chang as local counsel. (lom)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Epic Games, Inc., designating Yungmoon Chang as local counsel. (lom)
April 22, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami, Epic Games, Tencent Holdings, Ltd., AIG Specialty Insurance Company and Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Chang, Yungmoon)
April 22, 2022 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Epic Games, Inc. answer now due 5/27/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc..(Chang, Yungmoon)
April 22, 2022 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33178862) filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Chang, Yungmoon)
April 22, 2022 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33178815) filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Chang, Yungmoon)
April 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yungmoon Chang on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Attorney Yungmoon Chang added to party Epic Games, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chang, Yungmoon)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami, designating Kathryn Lee Boyd as local counsel #19 . (gk)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami, designating Kathryn Lee Boyd as local counsel #18 . (gk)
April 7, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami, upon Defendant Epic Games, Inc. served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leeza Puckett, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Systen, Registered Agent, authorized to accept service under F.R.C.P. Rule 4 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hecht, David)
April 7, 2022 Filing 19 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 4/5/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33076178) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hecht, David)
April 7, 2022 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/29/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33025574) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hecht, David)
April 6, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33076178) #16 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/29/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33025574) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt)
April 5, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33076178) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyd, Kathryn)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/29/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33025574) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyd, Kathryn)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pk)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33025574) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is not a Noticed Motion, but an Application. Please note DJ and MJ reassignment. (lt)
March 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David L Hecht on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (ghap)
March 29, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33025574) filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyd, Kathryn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami, identifying that there are no parties known to Plaintiff that have a pecuniary interest in the outcome of this case.. (Boyd, Kathryn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kyle Hanagami. (Boyd, Kathryn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Boyd, Kathryn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Boyd, Kathryn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 03/29/2022, receipt number ACACDC-33025216), filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hanagami. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration PA 2-277-839) (Attorney Kathryn Lee Boyd added to party Kyle Hanagami(pty:pla))(Boyd, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle Hanagami v. Epic Games, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hanagami
Represented By: Kathryn Lee Boyd
Represented By: David L. Hecht
Represented By: Maxim Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Represented By: Yungmoon Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?