In the Matter of the Complaint of Dordellas Finance Corp. Owner and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Owner
Plaintiff: DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP. and MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
In Re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Dordellas Finance Corp. Owner and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company
Consolidated Plaintiff: In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation
Special Master: Bradley O'Brien, Daniel Garrie and James L. Smith
3Rd Party Defendant: Capetanissa Maritime Corporation
Claimant: Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting, Inc. and Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399
Interested Party: John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., Beyond Business Incorporated doing business as Big Fish Bait & Tackle, Josh Hernandez, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, East Meets West Excursions, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Tyler Wayman, John Crowe, Quality Sea Food Inc., Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv02153
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., In Re In the Matter of the Complaint of Dordellas Finance Corp. Owner and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Regarding Supplemental Notice and Claim Forms by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE, EXTENSIONS OF TIME by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Patrick I. Andrews on behalf of Interested Parties Donald C. Brockman, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques (Attorney Patrick I. Andrews added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Patrick I. Andrews added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Patrick I. Andrews added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip))(Andrews, Patrick)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Avery S. Halfon on behalf of Interested Parties Donald C. Brockman, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques (Attorney Avery S. Halfon added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Avery S. Halfon added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Avery S. Halfon added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip))(Halfon, Avery)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Wilson M Dunlavey on behalf of Interested Parties Donald C. Brockman, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques (Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip))(Dunlavey, Wilson)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kelly K. McNabb on behalf of Interested Parties Donald C. Brockman, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques (Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip))(McNabb, Kelly)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STATUS REPORT and Agenda for October 3, 2022, SMP Hearing filed by Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Hazam, Lexi)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #114 Non-Resident Attorney Damaris Hernandez APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating David A. Tong as local counsel. (twdb)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean O Morris counsel for Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Adding Sean Morris as counsel of record for Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.(pty:pla))(Morris, Sean)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STATUS REPORT filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Notice of Submission to Special Master Panel filed by the Amplify Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Dordellas Finance Corp.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REQUESTING GOVERNMENT APPEARANCE. The Court REQUESTS representatives from the United States Army Corps of Engineers and the National Marine Fisheries Service to appear in court on October 3, 2022, at 10:00 am. ( Hearing set for 10/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STATUS REPORT Class Action Plaintiffs and Amplifys September 12, 2022, Discovery Status Report To Special Master Panel filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STATUS REPORT of REGARDING THE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE TO BE GIVEN IN THE CONSOLIDATED LIMITATION ACTION filed by Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Peacock, Albert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #92 Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, designating David A. Tong as local counsel; granting #97 Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, designating David A. Tong as local counsel; granting #99 Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, designating David A. Tong as local counsel. (twdb)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Damaris Hernandez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33958107) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MINUTES OF MOTION to MODIFY OR CLARIFY OR ALTERNATIVELY DISMISS COSTAMARE AND V. SHIPS AS LIMITATION ACTION PLAINTIFFS #108 Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: In light of the Court's order to lift the stay in case SA CV 21-01628-DOC-(JDEx) Peter Moses Gutierrez v. Amplify Energy Corporation, et al. (Dkt. 401), claimants' motion to modify or clarify or alternatively dismiss Costamare and V. Ships as limitation action plaintiffs is DENIED AS MOOT. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (bm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Issuing Supplemental Notice and Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (30), by Judge David O. Carter. For the reasons above, the Court ORDERS supplemental notice, and ORDERS the parties to confer regarding the form of the supplemental notice and provide a proposed order by September 12, 2022 at 12:00 pm. The form of the supplemental notice shall include some form of social media. The Special Master Panel is available to resolve any disputes. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to Strike. (twdb)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY OR CLARIFY OR ALTERNATIVELY DISMISS COSTAMARE AND V. SHIPS AS LIMITATION ACTION PLAINTIFFS #108 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Omid H. Nasab)(Attorney Kevin J. Orsini added to party Capetanissa Maritime Corporation(pty:3pd))(Orsini, Kevin)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STATUS REPORT September 1, 2022 Status Report filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY #108 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OBJECTIONS to Claim #80 filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Walsh, Joseph)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to MODIFY OR CLARIFY OR ALTERNATIVELY DISMISS COSTAMARE AND V. SHIPS AS LIMITATION ACTION PLAINTIFFS filed by claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Bentch) (Popham, Mitchell)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OBJECTIONS to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #69 filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Walsh, Joseph)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #102 Non-Resident Attorney Michael P. Addis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, designating David A Tong as local counsel. (lom)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #101 Non-Resident Attorney Lillian S. Grossbard APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, designating David A Tong as local counsel. (lom)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #93 #100 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J Orsini APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, designating David A Tong as local counsel. (lom)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTES OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6) AND 12 (C) #47 ; MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS CLAIM IN LIMITATION CLAIM, (DKT. 29) #48 Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter. Motion to dismiss class action claims pursuant to frcp 12(b)(6) and 12 (c) #47 and motion to strike class claim in limitation claim, (Dkt. 29) #48 are taken under submission. The Court's written order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (lom)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Paul Addis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33863039) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lillian S. Grossbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33862998) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Joseph Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/17/2022, Receipt No. 33826522) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/17/2022, Receipt No. 33826388) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/17/2022, Receipt No. 338 #97 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Joseph Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/17/2022, Receipt N #96 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/17/2022, Receipt No. 33826388) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Joseph Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/17/2022, Receipt No. 33826388) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Joseph Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33826522) #93 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33826388) #92 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed, as to local counsel. (sbou)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTIONS [30, 47, 48] by Judge David O. Carter: The Court ADVANCES the hearing on Plaintiff Capetanissa Maritime Corporations Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 47), and Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.s Motion to Strike Objection to Notice of Limitation Action and Monition Objection (Dkt. 30) and Motion to Strike Class Claim in Limitation Claim (Dkt. 48) to August 24, 2022 at 4 pm. (shb)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Joseph Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33826522) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33826388) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Notice CLAIMANTS' NOTICE AND CLARIFICATION OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Popham, Mitchell)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STATUS REPORT of August 15, 2022 filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPORT filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE filed by Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company, Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaranto Joinder (Motion Related), #67 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Andrews v. Plains)(Hazam, Lexi)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Claim in Limitation Claim, #29 #48 filed by Plaintiff Dordellas Finance Corp.. (Walsh, Joseph)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) AND 12(c) #47 filed by Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., identifying Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; Lloyds Syndicate 1036 (QBE European Co. Operations); Lloyds Syndicate 1221 (Navigators Underwriting Agency Ltd.); Lloyds Syndicate 1225 (AEGIS London); Lloyds Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting Ltd.); Lloyds Syndicate 1274 (Antares Syndicate 1274); Lloyds Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Ltd.); Lloyds Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1084 (The Chaucer Group); Lloyds Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Ltd.); HCC International Insurance Co. PLC.. (Popham, Mitchell)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #75 by Judge David O. Carter. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. Ascot Underwriting Inc. Certain Insurers at Lloyd's of London and London Company Markets Subscribing to Policy No. B0180ME2001399, designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. granting #75 Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Freehill (rolm)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #74 by Judge David O. Carter. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. Ascot Underwriting Inc. Certain Insurers at Lloyd's of London and London Company Markets Subscribing to Policy No. B0180ME2001399, designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. granting #74 Non-Resident Attorney Brooke L. Bentley (rolm)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #73 by Judge David O. Carter. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. Ascot Underwriting Inc. Certain Insurers at Lloyd's of London and London Company Markets Subscribing to Policy No. B0180ME2001399, designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. granting #73 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch (rolm)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #72 by Judge David O. Carter. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. Ascot Underwriting Inc. Certain Insurers at Lloyd's of London and London Company Markets Subscribing to Policy No. B0180ME2001399, designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. granting #72 Non-Resident Attorney J. Clifton Hall, III (rolm)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CLAIM filed by Claimants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Claimants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company, identifying Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyds Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyds Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyds Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyds Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyds Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); ; Lloyds Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California; Dordellas Finance Corp.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.r.l; ; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company Holding S.A.; United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Ltd.; The Swedish Club Academy AB; Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.; Capetanissa Maritime Corp.; V.Ships Greece, Ltd.; Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.R.L.; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran; Chandralekha Wickramasekaran; Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait &Tackle; Banzai Surf Company, LLC; Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.; East Meets West Excursions; Bongos Sportfishing LLC; Bongos III Sportfishing LLC; Tyler Wayman; Donald C. Brockman; Heidi M. Jacques; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Quality Sea Food Inc.; Josh Hernandez; John Crowe; Marysue Pedicini; John Pedicini; Peter Moses Gutierrez Jr. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #64 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Daniel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dordellas Finance Corp,. et al, designating Angel Tang Nakamura as local counsel. (twdb)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #69 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #70 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #51 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel T. Donovan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Defendants, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Freehill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33780320) filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke L. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33780243) filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33780037) filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney J. Clifton Hall, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-33779856) filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Claimants' Answer And Affirmative Defenses For Exoneration From, Or Limitation Of, Liability Filed By Plaintiff Capetanissa Maritime Corporation filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd..(Popham, Mitchell)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Claimants' Answer And Affirmative Defenses For Exoneration From, Or Limitation Of, Liability Filed By Plaintiffs Dorellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co., S.A. filed by Claimants Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting, Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399.(Attorney Mitchell J Popham added to party Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.(pty:clm), Attorney Mitchell J Popham added to party Ascot Underwriting, Inc.(pty:clm), Attorney Mitchell J Popham added to party Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399(pty:clm))(Popham, Mitchell)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. re Order,, #20 (Walsh, Joseph)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) AND 12(c) #47 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Claim in Limitation Claim, #29 #48 filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) AND 12(c) #47 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Claim in Limitation Claim, #29 #48 filed by Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company, Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rubin Article, #2 Exhibit B - Staring Article)(Hazam, Lexi)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STATUS REPORT of August 1, 2022 filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren C. Daniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33696324) filed by Plaintiff Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from NY Bar and DC Bar, #2 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Angel)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Approving Joint Stipulation Discovery Coordination Stipulation #54 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katie J. L. Scott counsel for Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Adding Katie J.L. Scott as counsel of record for DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attorney Katie J. L. Scott added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Katie J. L. Scott added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.(pty:pla))(Scott, Katie)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan W. Hughes counsel for Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Adding Jonathan W. Hughes as counsel of record for DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. (Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.(pty:pla))(Hughes, Jonathan)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angel Tang Nakamura counsel for Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Adding Angel Tang Nakamura as counsel of record for DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP. and MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff DORDELLAS FINANCE COPR. and MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.(pty:pla))(Nakamura, Angel)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff, CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION, (PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVITS) re Order,, #20 (Peacock, Albert)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff, CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION, re Order,, #19 (Peacock, Albert)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) AND 12(c) #47 filed by Plaintiff Dordellas Finance Corp.. (Walsh, Joseph)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STATUS REPORT July 15, 2022 filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Discovery #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Joint Discovery Coordination Stipulation filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company, Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran.(Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company(pty:ip))(Hazam, Lexi)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STATUS REPORT of July 1, 2022 filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #47 AND MOTION TO STRIKE #48 . The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. ( Motion hearing continued to 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel T. Donovan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33563891) filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. (Attachments: #1 DC Cert. of Good Standing, #2 OH Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark C Holscher counsel for Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. Adding Mark Holscher as counsel of record for Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:ip), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company(pty:ip))(Holscher, Mark)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company. Adding Christopher W. Keegan as counsel of record for Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Parties Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:ip), Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company(pty:ip))(Keegan, Christopher)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Class Claim in Limitation Claim, #29 filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walsh, Joseph)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CLASS ACTION CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) AND 12(c) filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. The Court sets the following dates for the non-stayed claims in the Coordinated Actions: #20 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REFERRING OBJECTIONS TO ORDER #24 AND MOTION TO STRIKE OBJECTION #30 TO SPECIAL MASTER PANEL. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Objection to Notice of Limitation Action and Monition Objection, #24 #30 filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Walsh, Joseph)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, re Order,, #20 DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF MONITION served on June 14, 2022,. (Peacock, Albert)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Objection to Notice of Limitation Action and Monition Objection, #24 #30 filed by Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Email from Andrews, #2 Exhibit B; Emails in response to Andrews)(Hazam, Lexi)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/23/2022 Vol. I and Vol. III re Transcript #39 , #40 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/23/2022 Vol. III. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). *Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.* Redaction Request due 7/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/23/2022 Vol.I. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). *Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.* Redaction Request due 7/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SPECIAL MASTER FEE ALLOCATION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS REPORT filed by Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Emily Hall at emily.hall@cwn-law.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Walsh, Joseph)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Objection to Notice of Limitation Action and Monition Objection, #24 #30 filed by Consol Plaintiff In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Peacock, Albert)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re Order,, #20 served on June 13, 2022. (Walsh, Joseph)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lexi J Hazam on behalf of Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran (Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bongos III Sportfishing LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bongos Sportfishing LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party John Crowe(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party East Meets West Excursions(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Josh Hernandez(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party John Pedicini(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Marysue Pedicini(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Quality Sea Food Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Tyler Wayman(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:ip), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran(pty:ip))(Hazam, Lexi)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Objection to Notice of Limitation Action and Monition Objection, #24 filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen E. McGlynn, #2 Proposed Order) (Walsh, Joseph)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLAIM filed by Claimants Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Hazam, Lexi)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CONSENT AND AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL MASTER DANIEL GARRIE, ESQ. filed by Special Master Daniel Garrie (rolm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT AND AFFIDAVIT OF Special Master Bradley O'Briend, Esq. filed by Special Master Bradley O'Brien (rolm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT AND AFFIDAVIT of Special Master Hon. James L. Smith (Ret.) filed by Special Master James L. Smith. (rolm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren O. Aitken on behalf of Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran (Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Bongos III Sportfishing LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Bongos Sportfishing LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party John Crowe(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party East Meets West Excursions(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Josh Hernandez(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party John Pedicini(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Marysue Pedicini(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Quality Sea Food Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Tyler Wayman(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:ip), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran(pty:ip))(Aitken, Darren)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OBJECTIONS to Order,, #20 filed by Interested Parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen Gerard Larson counsel for Interested Parties John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., Beyond Business Incorporated, Josh Hernandez, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, East Meets West Excursions, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Tyler Wayman, John Crowe, Quality Sea Food Inc., Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.. Adding Stephen G. Larson as counsel of record for JOHN PEDICINI and MARYSUE PEDICINI, individually and as Trustees of the T & G Trust; RAJASEKARAN WICKRAMASEKARAN and CHANDRALEKHA WICKRAMASEKARAN, individually and as Trustees of the Wickramasekaran Family Trust; DONALD C. BROCKMAN, individually and as Trustee of the Donald C. Brockman Trust; HEIDI M. JACQUES, individually and as Trustee of the Heidi M. Brockman Trust; LBC SEAFOOD, INC.; QUALITY SEA FOOD INC.; BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle; JOSH HERNANDEZ; JOHN CROWE; BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC; DAVEYS LOCKER SPORTFISHING, INC.; EAST MEETS WEST EXCURSIONS; BONGOS SPORTFISHING LLC; BONGOS III SPORTFISHING LLC; and TYLER WAYMAN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Parties JOHN PEDICINI and MARYSUE PEDICINI, individually and as Trustees of the T & G Trust; RAJASEKARAN WICKRAMASEKARAN and CHANDRALEKHA WICKRAMASEKARAN, individually and as Trustees of the Wickramasekaran Family Trust; DONALD C. BROCKMAN, individually and as Trustee of the Donald C. Brockman Trust; HEIDI M. JACQUES, individually and as Trustee of the Heidi M. Brockman Trust; LBC SEAFOOD, INC.; QUALITY SEA FOOD INC.; BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle; JOSH HERNANDEZ; JOHN CROWE; BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC; DAVEYS LOCKER SPORTFISHING, INC.; EAST MEETS WEST EXCURSIONS; BONGOS SPORTFISHING LLC; BONGOS III SPORTFISHING LLC; and TYLER WAYMAN. (Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party John Pedicini(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Marysue Pedicini(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Josh Hernandez(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party East Meets West Excursions(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Bongos Sportfishing LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Bongos III Sportfishing LLC(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Tyler Wayman(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party John Crowe(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Quality Sea Food Inc.(pty:ip), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:ip))(Larson, Stephen)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTERS by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER PANEL by Judge David O. Carter. The Court OVERRULES the Vessel Interests' objections and APPOINTS Bradley O'Brien, Daniel Garrie, and Judge James Smith as Special Masters in this action. (iv)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the institution or prosecution of any suit, action, or other legal or administrative proceeding of any nature in any venue against the Plaintiffs or the Vessels, regarding any claim resulting from, arising out of, or in connection with the Voyages ARE HEREBY ENJOINED, STAYED, AND RESTRAINED; said injunction is to remain in effect until the determination of this action in this Court. (iv)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: LIMITATION OF LIABILITY ACT by Judge David O. Carter. The Court CONSOLIDATES the Dordellas Action and the Capetanissa Action. The Court sets the following schedule for the consolidated limitation action: The vessel interests shall issue a formal notice by June 7, 2022. The notice shall be published until July 8, 2022. The period for all persons and entities claiming losses, damages, injuries, or death resulting or arising from the subject Voyages of the MSC Danit and the Beijing to file their claims shall be four months, ending on November 7, 2022. (iv)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to Appointment of Special Masters, and, In the Alternative, Motion for Consideration of an Admiralty Special Master Pursuant to FRCP 53(B)(1) filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Walsh, Joseph)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE #14 . The case is called. The Court and counsel confer regarding supplemental briefings addressing the issues as stated in the Courts order issued April 4, 2013 (Dkt. 14). The matter is taken under submission; the Courts order to issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale / Court Smart. (twdb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. to Supplemental Brief in Support of Order on Related Admiralty Cases (Attachments: #1 Figure 1)(Walsh, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Order on Related Admiralty Cases re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, #14 (Walsh, Joseph)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE by Judge David O. Carter. On March 31, 2022, Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., owners of the motor vessel MSC Danit, filed case No. 2:22-cv-02153-DOC-JDE, seeking exoneration and limitation of liability under admiralty jurisdiction. That case was transferred to this Court on April 6, 2022. The Court now ORDERS all parties in this case and the related case Peter Moses Gutierrez et al. v. Amplify Energy Corp. et al., No. 8:21-cv-01628-DOC-JDE case to submit supplemental briefing addressing the following issues, and any others the parties wish to address. All parties shall file simultaneous briefing by 4:00 pm Pacific Time on April 29, 2022. All parties shall file responsive briefing by 4:00 pm Pacific Time on May 9, 2022. The Court sets a hearing on these issues for May 23, 2022 at 10:00 am Pacific Time. The Court will continue the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss to a later date. See minute order for further details. (lom)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (dca)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-01628 DOC(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02153 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-01628-DOC-JDE (Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., identifying Dordellas Finance Corp.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.; Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Acquisitionco LLC; Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyd's Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyd's Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyd's Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyd's Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyd's Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.r.l.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company Holding S.A.; United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Ltd.; The Swedish Club Academy AB; Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.; Capetanissa Maritime Corp.; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran; Chandralekha Wickramasekaran; Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle; Banzai Surf Company, LLC; Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.; East Meets West Excursions; Bongos Sportfishing LLC; Bongos III Sportfishing LLC; Tyler Wayman; Donald C. Brockman; Heidi M. Jacques; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Qualify Sea Food Inc.; Josh Hernandez; John Crowe; Marysue Pedicini; John Pedicini; Peter Moses Gutierrez Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., identifying Dordellas Finance Corp.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.; Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Acquisitionco LLC; Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyd's Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyd's Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyd's Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyd's Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyd's Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.r.l.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company Holding S.A.; United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Ltd.; The Swedish Club Academy AB; Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.; Capetanissa Maritime Corp.; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran; Chandralekha Wickramasekaran; Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle; Banzai Surf Company, LLC; Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.; East Meets West Excursions; Bongos Sportfishing LLC; Bongos III Sportfishing LLC; Tyler Wayman; Donald C. Brockman; Heidi M. Jacques; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Qualify Sea Food Inc.; Josh Hernandez; John Crowe; Marysue Pedicini; John Pedicini; Peter Moses Gutierrez Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. identifying Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Acquisitionco LLC; Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyd's Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyd's Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyd's Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyd's Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyd's Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.r.l.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company Holding S.A.; United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Ltd.; The Swedish Club Academy AB; Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.; Capetanissa Maritime Corp.; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran; Chandralekha Wickramasekaran; Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle; Banzai Surf Company, LLC; Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.; East Meets West Excursions; Bongos Sportfishing LLC; Bongos III Sportfishing LLC; Tyler Wayman; Donald C. Brockman; Heidi M. Jacques; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Qualify Sea Food Inc.; Josh Hernandez; John Crowe; Marysue Pedicini; John Pedicini; Peter Moses Gutierrez Jr. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP. identifying Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Acquisitionco LLC; Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyd's Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyd's Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyd's Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyd's Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyd's Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); Lloyd's Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.r.l.; MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company Holding S.A.; United Kingdom Mutual Steamship Assurance Association (Europe) Ltd.; The Swedish Club Academy AB; Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.; Capetanissa Maritime Corp.; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran; Chandralekha Wickramasekaran; Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle; Banzai Surf Company, LLC; Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.; East Meets West Excursions; Bongos Sportfishing LLC; Bongos III Sportfishing LLC; Tyler Wayman; Donald C. Brockman; Heidi M. Jacques; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Qualify Sea Food Inc.; Josh Hernandez; John Crowe; Marysue Pedicini; John Pedicini; Peter Moses Gutierrez Jr. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ad Interim Stipulation of Value (Letter of Undertaking) filed by Plaintiffs DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Walsh, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33050397 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen E. McGlynn, #2 Exhibit A to Dec. of Ellen E. McGlynn, #3 Exhibit B to Dec. of Ellen E. McGlynn, #4 Declaration of Christine Kientz, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP.(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.(pty:pla))(Walsh, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of Dordellas Finance Corp. Owner and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Owner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP.
Represented By: Joseph A Walsh, II
Represented By: Ellen E McGlynn
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Katie J. L. Scott
Represented By: Lauren Daniel
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.
Represented By: Joseph A Walsh, II
Represented By: Ellen E McGlynn
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Katie J. L. Scott
Represented By: Lauren Daniel
Represented By: Sean O Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In the Matter of the Complaint of Dordellas Finance Corp. Owner and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: In Re the Matter of the Complaint of Capetanissa Maritime Corporation
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Represented By: David Andrew Tong
Represented By: Glen R Piper
Represented By: Margaret Stando
Represented By: Damaris Hernandez
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Lillian S. Grossbard
Represented By: Michael P. Addis
Represented By: Omid H. Nasab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Bradley O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Daniel Garrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: James L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Capetanissa Maritime Corporation
Represented By: Albert E Peacock, III
Represented By: David Andrew Tong
Represented By: Glen R Piper
Represented By: Margaret Stando
Represented By: Damaris Hernandez
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: David Ronald Rutan
Represented By: William Colin Mullen
Represented By: Brooke L. Bentley
Represented By: J. Clifton Hall, III
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bentch
Represented By: Mitchell J. Popham
Represented By: Robert E. Freehill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ascot Underwriting, Inc.
Represented By: David Ronald Rutan
Represented By: William Colin Mullen
Represented By: Brooke L. Bentley
Represented By: J. Clifton Hall, III
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bentch
Represented By: Mitchell J. Popham
Represented By: Robert E. Freehill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399
Represented By: David Ronald Rutan
Represented By: William Colin Mullen
Represented By: Brooke L. Bentley
Represented By: J. Clifton Hall, III
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bentch
Represented By: Mitchell J. Popham
Represented By: Robert E. Freehill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Pedicini
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Marysue Pedicini
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chandralekha Wickramasekaran
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donald C. Brockman
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Kelly K. McNabb
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Patrick I. Andrews
Represented By: Wilson M Dunlavey
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Heidi M. Jacques
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Kelly K. McNabb
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Patrick I. Andrews
Represented By: Wilson M Dunlavey
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LBC Seafood, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Beyond Business Incorporated doing business as Big Fish Bait & Tackle
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Josh Hernandez
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Banzai Surf Company, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: East Meets West Excursions
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bongos Sportfishing LLC
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bongos III Sportfishing LLC
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tyler Wayman
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Crowe
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Quality Sea Food Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick I. Andrews
Represented By: Stephen Gerard Larson
Represented By: Avery S. Halfon
Represented By: Wilson M Dunlavey
Represented By: Darren O. Aitken
Represented By: Wylie A Aitken
Represented By: Kelly K. McNabb
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Amplify Energy Corp.
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Represented By: Daniel T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Beta Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Represented By: Daniel T. Donovan
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: San Pedro Bay Pipleine Company
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Represented By: Daniel T. Donovan
Represented By: Lexi J Hazam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?