Summit Tool Company v. Vevor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Summit Tool Company and Summit Tool Company doing business as Ken-Tool
Defendant: Vevor Corporation, Wildfiore Corporation, Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd., Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd, Rubao Jiao, Sanven Corporation and Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2022cv02161
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe)
August 11, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-02161 AB(JCx). (rn)
August 10, 2022 Filing 27 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd., Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd (hr)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. On July 27, 2022, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution (ECF #23 ). On August 10, 2022, Plaintiff filed a response to the Order to Show Cause (ECF #24 , #25 ). The Court deems the response satisfactory and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Companyto REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd, Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd. #24 , Order to Show Cause, #23 (Moser, Christina)
August 10, 2022 Filing 24 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd, Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd. filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. Request set for hearing on 9/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Moser Declaration ISO Request to Enter Default) (Moser, Christina)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, on or before August 10, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 5, 2022 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Moser, Christina)
July 5, 2022 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company, upon Defendant Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd served on 6/29/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sanven Corporation as general manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moser, Christina)
July 5, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company, upon Defendant Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd. served on 6/29/2022, answer due 7/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sanven Corporation as general manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moser, Christina)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Summit Tool Company, Shanghai Sishun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd. served on 06/29/2022. (Moser, Christina)
June 28, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company, upon Defendant Sanven Corporation served on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, person authorized to accept service on behalf of Sanven Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moser, Christina)
June 24, 2022 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd. (et)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd. (et)
June 22, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons to SSE)(Moser, Christina)
June 20, 2022 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Sanven Corporation. (Mu, Shengmao)
June 20, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sanven Corporation.(Mu, Shengmao)
June 20, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sanven Corporation, (Mu, Shengmao)
June 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shengmao Mu on behalf of Defendant Sanven Corporation (Attorney Shengmao Mu added to party Sanven Corporation (pty:dft))(Mu, Shengmao)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Summit Tool Company. (Moser, Christina)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Rubao Jiao, Sanven Corporation, Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd, Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd., Vevor Corporation and Wildfiore Corporation. (jtil)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Moser, Christina)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company, (Moser, Christina)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Wildfiore Corproation, #2 Summons to Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd, #3 Summons to Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd, #4 Summons to Rubao Jiao, #5 Summons to Sanven Corporation)(Moser, Christina)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33050445 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Summit Tool Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 834 Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - 142 Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cease and Desist Letter) (Attorney Christina J Moser added to party Summit Tool Company(pty:pla))(Moser, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Tool Company v. Vevor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Tool Company
Represented By: Christina J Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Tool Company doing business as Ken-Tool
Represented By: Christina J Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vevor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildfiore Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanghai SiShun Machinery Equipment Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubao Jiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanven Corporation
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?