ONeater J. George v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: O'Neater George and ONeater J. George
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, NewRez, LLC and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv02199
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 7/11/2022 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for 5/13/2022 and issues this case management order. The parties' joint request to appear remotely #17 is denied as moot. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report #16 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order based on its evaluation of the level complexity of the case (which is low). Jury Trial set for 1/17/2023 at 8:30 AM. Pretrial Conference and hearing on Motions in Limine set for 1/6/2023 at 10:00 AM. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 7/11/2022. Non-Expert Discovery Deadline 9/9/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 9/16/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 9/16/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 9/30/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 8:30 AM. Status Report Due 10/7/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 12/16/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 12/23/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 3, 2022 Filing 17 Joint REQUEST for Leave of Benjamin White and O'Neater J. George to Appear for Scheduling Conference Remotely filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Request set for hearing on 5/13/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (White, Benjamin)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (White, Benjamin)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on May 13, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by May 3, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED (PRO SE) LITIGANT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Although Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, i.e., without legal representation, you are nonetheless required to comply with Court orders, the Local Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 83-2.2.3. The Local Rules are available on this Courts website. There is a free "Pro Se Clinic" that can provide information and guidance about many aspects of civil litigation in this Court. The Clinic is located at the Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Pro se litigants must call or submit an on-line application to request services as follows: on-line applications can be submitted at http://prose.cacd.uscourts.gov/los-angeles, or call (213) 385-2977, ext. 270. Pro se litigants may submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. Only internet access and an e-mail address are required. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2;22-cv-02199 SB(MARx). (rn)
April 14, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, re Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #10 served on April 14, 2022. (White, Benjamin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (White, Benjamin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The matter is set for a scheduling conference on Tuesday, May 31, 2022, at10 a.m. See Order for details. (es)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. For cases removed to this Court from Superior Court, the joint or separate consent forms must be filed within fourteen (14) days after the notice of removal is filed with the Court (L.R. 73-2.4.2). (ib)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #6 served on April 8, 2022. (White, Benjamin)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(White, Benjamin)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
April 1, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation amending Complaint, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff ONeater J. George(lh)
April 1, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed by Plaintiff ONeater J. George. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/02/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant NewRez, LLC identifying Shellpoint Partners, LLC, New Residential Investment Corporation as Corporate Parent. (White, Benjamin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (White, Benjamin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (White, Benjamin)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22TRCV00073 Receipt No: ACACDC-33061790 - Fee: $402, filed by defendants NewRez, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Benjamin William White added to party NewRez, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin William White added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(White, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONeater J. George v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Neater George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONeater J. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin William White
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin William White
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?