DONGSHENG YIN et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: DONGSHENG YIN, YUMEI PEI, ZHIYU YIN, CHAO WANG, YANG LIU and ZITONG WANG
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services California Service Center
Case Number: 2:2022cv02271
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 16 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant DIRECTOR OF THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES CALIFORNIA SERVICE CENTER and UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (jtil)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Louisa Wu APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dongsheng Yin., et al., designating Arthur Minas as local counsel. (twdb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Louisa Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33132487) filed by Plaintiff YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Petition for Name Change Doc) (Minas, Arthur)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (dca)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-01758 DOC(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02271 DOC(ADSx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
April 7, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants DIRECTOR OF THE UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES CALIFORNIA SERVICE CENTER, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Director USCIS, #2 USCIS) (jtil)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #5 , Summons Request, #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN. (Minas, Arthur)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN. (Minas, Arthur)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request, #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN. (Minas, Arthur)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN. (Minas, Arthur)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN, (Minas, Arthur)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs YANG LIU, YUMEI PEI, CHAO WANG, ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, ZHIYU YIN. (Minas, Arthur)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33074211 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff ZITONG WANG, DONGSHENG YIN, CHAO WANG, ZHIYU YIN, YUMEI PEI, YANG LIU. (Attorney Arthur Minas added to party YANG LIU(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party YUMEI PEI(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party CHAO WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party ZITONG WANG(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party DONGSHENG YIN(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur Minas added to party ZHIYU YIN(pty:pla))(Minas, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DONGSHENG YIN et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONGSHENG YIN
Represented By: Arthur Minas
Represented By: Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUMEI PEI
Represented By: Arthur Minas
Represented By: Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHIYU YIN
Represented By: Arthur Minas
Represented By: Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAO WANG
Represented By: Arthur Minas
Represented By: Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YANG LIU
Represented By: Arthur Minas
Represented By: Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZITONG WANG
Represented By: Arthur Minas
Represented By: Louisa Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of The United States Citizenship and Immigration Services California Service Center
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?