Leah Flores v. JD E-Commerce America Limited et al
Plaintiff: Leah Flores
Defendant: JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.com American Technologies Corporation, Jingdong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc., DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Jingdong E-Commerce Trade Hong Kong Corporation Limited and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv02506
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 34 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (rolm)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE #32 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, the following is hereby ORDERED: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. All previously set dates are vacated and off-calendar. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
October 19, 2022 Filing 32 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Leah Flores. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Novian, Farhad)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 22, 2022 Filing 30 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference previously scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Jury trial is set for 11/29/2022 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 11/21/2022 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 19, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Gerst counsel for Plaintiff Leah Flores. Adding Michael Gerst as counsel of record for Leah Flores for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Leah Flores. (Attorney Michael E Gerst added to party Leah Flores (pty:pla))(Gerst, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/25/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 21, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.com American Technologies Corporation, identifying JD.com International Limited. (Zhang, Ping)
June 21, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Defendants JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.com American Technologies Corporation.(Zhang, Ping)
June 21, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., (Zhang, Ping)
June 21, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc..(Zhang, Ping)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/21/2022 re Complaint filed by Defendants #22 - The application is GRANTED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 9, 2022 Filing 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/21/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.com American Technologies Corporation, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Ping Zhang in Support of Ex Parte Application) (Zhang, Ping)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 11, 2022 #20 - DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 9, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 11, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.com American Technologies Corporation, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Zhang, Ping)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 11, 2022 re Complaint #18 : The stipulation is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 11, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.com American Technologies Corporation, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zhang, Ping)
May 23, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JD.com American Technologies Corporation answer now due 6/13/2022; JD E-Commerce America Limited answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants JD.com American Technologies Corporation; JD E-Commerce America Limited.(Attorney Ping Zhang added to party JD E-Commerce America Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Ping Zhang added to party JD.com American Technologies Corporation(pty:dft))(Zhang, Ping)
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leah Flores, upon Defendant JD.com American Technologies Corporation served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leah Flores, upon Defendant JD E-Commerce America Limited served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad)
May 11, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Walmart, Inc. answer now due 6/10/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc..(Attorney Mike Margolis added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Margolis, Mike)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Walmart, Inc. (car)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jingdong E-Commerce Trade Hong Kong Corporation Limited. (car)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant JD.com American Technologies Corporation. (car)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant JD E-Commerce America Limited. (car)
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Leah Flores. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request, #2 Summons Request, #3 Summons Request)(Novian, Farhad)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Leah Flores. (Novian, Farhad)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leah Flores, identifying JD E-COMMERCE AMERICA LIMITED; JD.COM AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; JINGDONG E-COMMERCE (TRADE) HONG KONG CORPORATION LIMITED; WALMART, INC.. (Novian, Farhad)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leah Flores. (Novian, Farhad)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33125506 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Leah Flores. (Attorney Farhad Novian added to party Leah Flores (pty:pla))(Novian, Farhad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leah Flores v. JD E-Commerce America Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Flores
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander Kandel
Represented By: Jared C Xu
Represented By: Jared C. Xu
Represented By: Michael E Gerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD E-Commerce America Limited
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD.com American Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingdong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Represented By: Mike Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingdong E-Commerce Trade Hong Kong Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?