International Manufacturing Concepts Inc. v. Justin Bieber et al
Plaintiff: International Manufacturing Concepts Inc. a Nevada corporation doing business as Melomega Music doing business as Sound Gems
Defendant: W Chappell Music Corp. a California corporation doing business as WC Music Corp. formerly known as WB Music Corp., Justin Bieber, Dan Smyers, Shay Mooney, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jordan Reynolds, Jason Boyd, Warner Music Nashville LLC, WB Music Corp., BMG Rights Management US LLC doing business as BMG Gold Songs, Warner Music Group Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Universal Music Corporation, Poo BZ Inc. a California corporation doing business as Poo BZ Publishing doing business as Poo B Z Publishing Inc, Big Machine Music LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Big Music Machine, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Shay Mooney Music, Biebertime Publishing LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Bieber Time Publishing, Buckeye26, Jreyn Productions LLC a Tennessee limited liability company doing business as Jreynmusic, Beats and Banjos, Does 1 through 50 inclusive, DELAWARE MOJO, L.P., MOJO CAYMAN, L.P. and Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two
Case Number: 2:2022cv02650
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice Delaware Mojo, L.P. and, in its Place, Name Songs of Mojo LLC DBA Songs of Mojo Two as a Defendant [DE[ 55]] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall have until seven (7) days from the issuance of this Order to file an amended complaint naming Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two as a defendant, as well as change all references to " Delaware Mojo, L.P." to refer to "Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two." (jp)
January 25, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MOJO CAYMAN, L.P., Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two, identifying CL Opp III Mojo Fund, Blue Glacier Fund, L.P., and Mojo Music & Media Group Limited. (Akley, Benjamin)
January 25, 2023 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #48 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants MOJO CAYMAN, L.P., Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two.(Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two(pty:dft))(Akley, Benjamin)
January 24, 2023 Filing 55 STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint/Petition #48 filed by Defendant MOJO CAYMAN, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Akley, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party MOJO CAYMAN, L.P.(pty:dft))(Akley, Benjamin)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Order to Show Cause #53 issued on 1/12/2023 is hereby vacated as issued in error. No responses are required by 1/20/2023. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (DOCUMENT VACATED PER ORDER 54 .) - (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 1/20/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to certain defendant/s. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp) Modified on 1/17/2023 (jre).
December 27, 2022 Filing 52 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #48 as to Defendants DELAWARE MOJO, L.P., MOJO CAYMAN, L.P. (jp)
December 22, 2022 Filing 51 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #48 filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Summons)(Silbert, Sarah)
December 21, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #49 . The following error(s) was found: (1) The caption of the summons must match the caption of the first amended complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached.Next, attach a face page of the First Amended Complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. (2) Please indicate as to "FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT" right after SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
December 20, 2022 Filing 49 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #48 filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Silbert, Sarah)
December 20, 2022 Filing 48 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint)(Silbert, Sarah)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #46 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. WHEREAS good cause is shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, based upon the concurrently filed Stipulation of the parties thereto, as follows: 1. Plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts, Inc. may file the First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the Stipulation (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 10, 2022 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation for Filing of First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Tre Lovell in support of Stipulation for Filing of First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Filing of First Amended Complaint)(Silbert, Sarah)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 28, 2023. (jre)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023, at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
October 17, 2022 Filing 43 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2022. Discovery cut-off 3/29/2023. Motions due by 4/12/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023, at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023, at 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (jre)
October 7, 2022 Filing 42 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and factual summary of the case ; estimated length of trial 10 - 14 days, filed by Plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc... (Silbert, Sarah)
September 28, 2022 Filing 41 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant BMG Rights Management US LLC filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc..(Lovell, Tre)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2022, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE and ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Order to Show Cause #28 issued on 8/31/2022 is hereby DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 2, 2022 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BMG Rights Management US LLC.(Jacobs, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMG Rights Management US LLC, identifying BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (Jacobs, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah Emily Moses counsel for Defendant BMG Rights Management US LLC. Adding Sarah E. Moses as counsel of record for BMG Rights Management (US) LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (Attorney Sarah Emily Moses added to party BMG Rights Management US LLC(pty:dft))(Moses, Sarah)
September 2, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert A Jacobs counsel for Defendant BMG Rights Management US LLC. Adding Robert A. Jacobs as counsel of record for BMG Rights Management (US) LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMG Rights Management (US) LLC. (Attorney Robert A Jacobs added to party BMG Rights Management US LLC(pty:dft))(Jacobs, Robert)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BMG TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #33 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (lom)
September 2, 2022 Filing 33 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant BMG to Respond to Complaint)(Lovell, Tre)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Jessica L Rosen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33913765) filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, designating Benjamin S. Akley as local counsel. (lom)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Ilene Farkas APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33913765) filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, designating Benjamin S. Akley as local counsel. (lom)
September 1, 2022 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica L Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33913859) filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Akley, Benjamin)
September 1, 2022 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ilene S Farkas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33913765) filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Akley, Benjamin)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 9/6/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to certain defendant/s. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
August 26, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jessica L Rosen. A document #22 recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jp)
August 26, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ilene S. Farkas. A document #22 recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jp)
August 26, 2022 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notice of Interested Parties. filed by Defendants Jason Boyd, Poo BZ Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (King, Howard)
August 25, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY JASON BOYD AND POO BZ INC. filed by Defendant Jason Boyd, Poo BZ Inc..(King, Howard)
August 25, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Machine Music LLC, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., identifying AI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Universal Music Group, N.V., Hybe Co., Ltd, Labore et Perseverantia LLC, Mojo Cayman LP, Songs of Mojo LLC. (Akley, Benjamin)
August 25, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp..(Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music(pty:dft))(Akley, Benjamin)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR CERTAIN DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER COMPLAINT #20 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendants BMG Rights Management US LLC, Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Machine Music LLC, Jason Boyd, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Poo BZ Inc., Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, and Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. answer due by 8/25/2022. (rolm)
August 9, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 25, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Akley, #2 Proposed Order)(Akley, Benjamin)
July 22, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Buckeye26. (Lovell, Tre)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING FOR CERTAIN DEFENDENTS TO ANSWER COMPLAINT #12 by Judge R. Gary Klausner as follows: Defendants Justin Bieber; Dan Smyers; Shay Mooney; Jessie Jo Dillon; Jordan Reynolds; Warner Music Nashville, LLC; W Chappell Music Corp.; Warner Music Group Corp.; Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Universal Music Corporation; Big Machine Music LLC; Shay Mooney Music; Biebertime Publishing, LLC; Jreyn Productions LLC; Beats and Banjos; BMG Rights Management (US) LLC; Jason Boyd; Poo BZ Inc.; and BUCKEYE26 shall have up to and including 8/15/2022 to respond to the Complaint. (jp)
July 7, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. upon Jessie Jo Dillon waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Shay Mooney waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022; Poo BZ Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/17/2022, answer due 8/16/2022; Dan Smyers waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. Waiver of Service signed by counsel for defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Waiver-Dan Smyers, #2 Exhibit B Waiver-Shay Mooney, #3 Exhibit C Waiver-Jessie Jo Dillon, #4 Exhibit D Waiver-Poo BZ Inc.)(Silbert, Sarah)
July 7, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc., upon Defendant BMG Rights Management US LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022; Beats and Banjos served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; Justin Bieber served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022; Biebertime Publishing LLC served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022; Big Machine Music LLC served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022; Jason Boyd served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; Buckeye26 served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; Jreyn Productions LLC served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022; Jordan Reynolds served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022; Shay Mooney Music served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022; Universal Music Corporation served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022; W Chappell Music Corp. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022; Warner Music Group Corp. served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022; Warner Music Nashville LLC served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022; Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon agents for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Parties have stipulated to extensions of time (ECF 12). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proof of Service on Justin Bieber, #2 Exhibit B Proof of Service on Jordan Reynolds, #3 Exhibit C Proof of Service on Jason Boyd, #4 Exhibit D Proof of Service on Warner Music Nashville, LLC, #5 Exhibit E Proof of Service on BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, #6 Exhibit F Proof of Service on Warner Music Group Corp., #7 Exhibit G Proof of Service on Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., #8 Exhibit H Proof of Service on Universal Music Corporation, #9 Exhibit I Proof of Service on Shay Mooney Music, #10 Exhibit J Proof of Service on Biebertime Publishing, LLC, #11 Exhibit K Proof of Service on Buckeye26, #12 Exhibit L Proof of Service on Jreyn Productions LLC, #13 Exhibit M Proof of Service on Beats and Banjos, #14 Exhibit N Proof of Service on W Chappell Music Corp., #15 Exhibit O Proof of Service on Big Machine Music LLC)(Silbert, Sarah)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Howard E King counsel for Defendant Jason Boyd. Adding JACKSON S. TRUGMAN, ESQ. as counsel of record for Defendants JASON BOYD and POO BZ, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants JASON BOYD and POO BZ, INC.. (King, Howard)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Howard E King counsel for Defendant Jason Boyd. Adding Howard E. King, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendants Jason Boyd and Poo BZ, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants JASON BOYD and POO BZ, INC.. (Attorney Howard E King added to party Jason Boyd(pty:dft))(King, Howard)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court has reviewed the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint #12 filed on 7/5/2022. Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall immediately file proof of service of the summons and complaint, no later than 7/7/2022. Proofs of service should have been filed within 5 days of service. See Standing Order #10 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 15, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Machine Music LLC, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin S. Akley, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Beats and Banjos(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Justin Bieber(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Biebertime Publishing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Big Machine Music LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Jessie Jo Dillon(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Jreyn Productions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Shay Mooney(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Jordan Reynolds(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Shay Mooney Music(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Dan Smyers(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Universal Music Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party W Chappell Music Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Warner Music Group Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Warner Music Nashville LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin S. Akley added to party Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.(pty:dft))(Akley, Benjamin)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Sarah A Silbert counsel for Plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. Changing Firm Name to The Lovell Firm. Filed by Plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Silbert, Sarah)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants BMG Rights Management US LLC, Beats and Banjos, Justin Bieber, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Big Machine Music LLC, Jason Boyd, Buckeye26, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jreyn Productions LLC, Shay Mooney, Poo BZ Inc., Jordan Reynolds, Shay Mooney Music, Dan Smyers, Universal Music Corporation, W Chappell Music Corp., Warner Music Group Corp., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (lh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Lovell, Tre)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc., identifying International Manufacturing Concepts, Inc., Justin Bieber, Dan Smyers, Shay Mooney, Jessie Jo Dillon, Jordan Reynolds, Jason Boyd, Warner Music Nashville LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., WC Music Corp., BMG Righs Management (US) LLC, Warner Music Group Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Universal Music Corporation, Poo BZ Inc., Big Machine Music LLC, Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music, Shay Mooney Music, Biebertime Publishing LLC, Buckeye26, Jreyn Productions LLC, Beats and Banjos. (Lovell, Tre)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Lovell, Tre)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Lovell, Tre)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33165126 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Tre Lovell added to party International Manufacturing Concepts Inc.(pty:pla))(Lovell, Tre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Manufacturing Concepts Inc. v. Justin Bieber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Chappell Music Corp. a California corporation doing business as WC Music Corp. formerly known as WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bieber
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Smyers
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shay Mooney
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Jo Dillon
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Reynolds
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Boyd
Represented By: Jackson Samuel Trugman
Represented By: Howard E King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Nashville LLC
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMG Rights Management US LLC doing business as BMG Gold Songs
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Represented By: Robert A Jacobs
Represented By: Sarah Emily Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poo BZ Inc. a California corporation doing business as Poo BZ Publishing doing business as Poo B Z Publishing Inc
Represented By: Jackson Samuel Trugman
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Machine Music LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Big Music Machine
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Ass Pile of Dimes Music
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shay Mooney Music
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biebertime Publishing LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Bieber Time Publishing
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye26
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jreyn Productions LLC a Tennessee limited liability company doing business as Jreynmusic
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beats and Banjos
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Ilene S Farkas
Represented By: Jessica L Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE MOJO, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOJO CAYMAN, L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Songs of Mojo LLC dba Songs of Mojo Two
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Manufacturing Concepts Inc. a Nevada corporation doing business as Melomega Music doing business as Sound Gems
Represented By: Tre Lovell
Represented By: Sarah A Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?