Tara Hargrove v. Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tara Hargrove
Defendant: Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc. and W.P. Appliances, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02863
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove, upon Defendant W.P. Appliances, Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sydney Silverman, Registered Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Harlan, Jordon)
May 10, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove, upon Defendant Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/5/2022, answer due 5/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Martin Levy, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Harlan, Jordon)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. Kress to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Hargrove and designating Jordan Harlan as local counsel #16 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. Kress to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Hargrove (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33238175) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application and proposed order are inconsistent. Application has local counsel in San Diego, proposed order has attorney in Hermosa Beach. (lt)
May 4, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. Kress to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Hargrove (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33238175) filed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Harlan, Jordon)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
April 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong form should be CV-71. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, 12 . Document number 12 due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image of the new action. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 12 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 4/29/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 13] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Wrong form should be CV-71. (ghap) Modified on 4/29/2022 (ghap).
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam J Kress on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant W.P. Appliances, Inc. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove. (Harlan, Jordon)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove, identifying Tara Hargrove, Adam J. Kress, Jordon R. Harlan, Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc., W.P. Appliances, Inc.. (Harlan, Jordon)
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove. (Harlan, Jordon)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove. (Harlan, Jordon)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33213025 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tara Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Jordon R. Harlan added to party Tara Hargrove(pty:pla))(Harlan, Jordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tara Hargrove v. Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Hargrove
Represented By: Jordon R. Harlan
Represented By: Adam J. Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfgang Puck Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.P. Appliances, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?