Todd Williamson v. Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Todd Williamson
Defendant: Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation, McDonalds Corporation and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv03065
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Todd Williamson, upon Defendant McDonalds Corporation served on 5/23/2022, answer due 7/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Customer Service Liaison for the agent of service,The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, Lauren)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to McDonalds Corporation answer now due 7/13/2022, filed by Defendant McDonalds Corporation.(Attorney Carol Yur added to party McDonalds Corporation(pty:dft))(Yur, Carol)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Todd Williamsonto Order to Show Cause, #11 re: Court's Exercise of Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff ISO Response to OSC, #2 Declaration of Peter Shahriari ISO Response to OSC)(Davis, Lauren)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pk)
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. In light of the foregoing, the parties are ORDERED to issue a joint status report at least 7 days prior to the initial status conference. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within 14 days of this order. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS]. (aco)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant McDonalds Corporation. (et)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation. (et)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Todd Williamson, (Shahriari, Peter)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Todd Williamson. (Shahriari, Peter)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Todd Williamson. (Shahriari, Peter)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Todd Williamson. (Shahriari, Peter)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33253040 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Todd Williamson. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Todd Williamson(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd Williamson v. Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Williamson
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Represented By: Lauren Rae Davis
Represented By: Valerie Lissa Bradbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonalds Corporation
Represented By: Ramnik Singh Pujji
Represented By: Carol Yur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?