Kendrick Sampson v. The City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Kendrick Sampson
Defendant: The City of Los Angeles, The City of Los Angeles Police Department (LAPD), CHIEF MICHEL MOORE, Jeritt Severns, Alan Salazar, Officer Oscar Robert Arias, Ruben Rodriguez, David Martin, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, The Los Angeles Police Department, Officer Jeritt Severns, Officer Allan Salazar, Officer Oscar Arias, Officer Ruben Rodriguez, Officer David Martin and Does 1-10 inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Richard Copeland
Case Number: 2:2022cv03346
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO CHIEF MICHEL MOORE (DKT. 38) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the parties' Second Stipulation to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint as to Chief Michel Moore. sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The deadline for Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson to file an Amended Complaint, including as to Chief Michel Moore, is extended to June 15, 2023. All other dates and deadlines in the Scheduling Order remain unchanged. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
April 25, 2023 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Lawrence S. Middleton re Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend #38 filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Middleton, Lawrence)
April 24, 2023 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #33 filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO CHIEF MICHEL MOORE (DKT. #36 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the Stipulation to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint as to Chief Michel Moore (the Stipulation (Dkt. 36)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED, as follows: The time allowed for Plaintiff to file an amended complaint as to Chief Michel Moore is extended to May 1, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
January 19, 2023 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, #33 filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
November 23, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
November 22, 2022 Filing 34 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - ADR-02 Stipulation Re Selection of Panel Member)(Middleton, Lawrence)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE CHIEF MICHEL MOORE'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 17) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: For the reasons stated in this Order, the Motion is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Any amended complaint shall be filed within 60 days of the issuance of this Order. (see document for further details) (bm)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (DKT. 27) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court has reviewed the parties November 4, 2022 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: May 1, 2023 is the last day to amend pleadings or add parties. July 10, 2023 is the Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off. July 24, 2023 for Initial Expert Disclosures. August 7, 2023 for Rebuttal Expert Disclosures. August 14, 2023 for the Expert Discovery Cut-Off. August 21, 2023 is the last day to file all Motions (including discovery motions). September 12, 2023 is the last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation. September 22, 2023 is the last day to file a notice of settlement or a joint report re settlement. October 2, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. is set for a Post Mediation Status Conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 12, 2023. Post Mediaton Status Conference set for 10/2/2023 11:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (tj)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTICE: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CHANGING THE TIME FOR MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore (as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) #17 HEARING by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On the Court's own motion, the TIME for the motion hearing is reset from 8:30 a.m. to 10:15 a.m. on November 15, 2022. The parties may appear by ZOOM or IN PERSON. If Counsel plans to appear via zoom, then Counsel are directed to refer to the Court's Procedures and Schedules page found on the website for the United States District Court for zoom webinar information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING NOTICE: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore (as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) HEARING (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court on its own motion, continues the Motion Hearing from November 14, 2022 to November 15, 2022. The time of the hearing will be determined upon the issuance of the final calendar for that date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2022 Filing 27 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT of Report of Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates)(Middleton, Lawrence)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #17 ) from November 7, 2022, at 8:30 a.m., to November 14, 2022, at 8:30 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (JAKLC2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT MICHAEL MOORE'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues Defendant Michael Moore's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #17 ) from October 24, 2022, at 8:30 a.m., to November 7, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (JAKLC2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 19, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) #17 filed by Defendant Michel Moore. (Piasecki, Kyle)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHIEF MICHEL MOORES MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) AND SETTING DATE FOR DEFENDANT CHIEF MICHEL MOORES REPLY by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the Stipulation to Allow Filing of Plaintiffs Amended Response in Opposition to Defendant Chief Michel Moores Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Setting Date for Defendant Chief Michel Moores Reply (the Stipulation (Dkt. 21)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (rolm)
August 16, 2022 Filing 22 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) #17 AMENDED filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Middleton, Lawrence)
August 10, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) #17 filed by plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
August 9, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) #17 filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Middleton, Lawrence)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2022. (tj)
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Oscar Arias, David Martin, Ruben Rodriguez, Ruben Rodriguez, Allan Salazar, Jeritt Severns, The City of Los Angeles, The Los Angeles Police Department.(Lee, Lisa)
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department) filed by Defendant Michel Moore(individually). Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Piasecki, Kyle)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-CV-05510 JAK(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03346 JAK(ADSx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
July 11, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Oscar Arias, David Martin, Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Ruben Rodriguez, Allan Salazar, Jeritt Severns, The City of Los Angeles, The Los Angeles Police Department. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-05510-JAK-ADS (Lee, Lisa)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Oscar Arias answer now due 7/19/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Oscar Arias.(Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party Oscar Arias(pty:dft))(Ginter, Brian)
June 28, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Los Angeles Police Department answer now due 7/19/2022; Michel Moore(individually) answer now due 7/19/2022; Allan Salazar answer now due 7/19/2022; Ruben Rodriguez answer now due 7/19/2022; David Martin answer now due 7/19/2022; Jeritt Severns answer now due 7/19/2022; The City of Los Angeles answer now due 7/19/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants The Los Angeles Police Department; Michel Moore(individually); Allan Salazar; Ruben Rodriguez; David Martin; Jeritt Severns; The City of Los Angeles.(Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party David Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party Ruben Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party Allan Salazar(pty:dft), Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party Jeritt Severns(pty:dft), Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party The City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Brian S Ginter added to party The Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft))(Ginter, Brian)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 (Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party David Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party Ruben Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party Allan Salazar(pty:dft), Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party Jeritt Severns(pty:dft), Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party The City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Charles E Slyngstad added to party The Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft))(Slyngstad, Charles)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Oscar Arias, David Martin, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore( as a supervisor, and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Ruben Rodriguez, Ruben Rodriguez, Allan Salazar, Jeritt Severns, The City of Los Angeles, The Los Angeles Police Department. (shb)
May 26, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,, #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Middleton, Lawrence)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson, (Middleton, Lawrence)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet was e-filed under the wrong event. The Clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect that docket item 2 is the Civil Cover Sheet. (car)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 [CIVIL COVER SHEET] FILED AS COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 05/17/2022, receipt number ACACDC-33315349), filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson.(Middleton, Lawrence) Modified on 5/18/2022 (car).
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33315349 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Attorney Lawrence S Middleton added to party Kendrick Sampson(pty:pla))(Middleton, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendrick Sampson v. The City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Sampson
Represented By: Lawrence S Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Los Angeles Police Department (LAPD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF MICHEL MOORE
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeritt Severns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oscar Robert Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Los Angeles Police Department
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jeritt Severns
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Allan Salazar
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oscar Arias
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ruben Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer David Martin
Represented By: Charles E Slyngstad
Represented By: Kyle Anne Piasecki
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Brian S Ginter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Richard Copeland
Represented By: Richard T Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?