Leanne Szymczak v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leanne Szymczak
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03684
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION #37 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court continues the filing deadline of Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses from October 25, 2023 to December 27, 2023.The Court retains Jurisdiction over the action until Plaintiffs' fees, costs, and expenses are decided and funding satisfied. (lc)
October 25, 2023 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION for Order Order To Continue Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Order To Continue Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction)(Dolin, Tionna)
October 11, 2023 Filing 36 JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff LEANNE SZYMCZAK accepted Defendant FCA US, LLCs Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68 on September 5, 2023 #35 . Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $142,126.64 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. All dates are VACATED. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case.. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $142,126.64 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. All dates are VACATED. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (lc)
October 9, 2023 Filing 35 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) (Dolin, Tionna)
August 10, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Leanne Szymczak for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Leanne Szymczak(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2023 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Leanne Szymczak(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES #30 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
April 12, 2023 Filing 30 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines from Currently Set to 120 days later or as ordered by the Court filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Leanne Szymczak. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
November 22, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Leanne Szymczak for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2023 01:30 PM ; Jury Trial set for 11/7/2023 09:00 AM ; Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2023 at 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
August 22, 2022 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 15, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
July 8, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 7, 2022 Filing 23 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 6, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 6, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for August 29, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA HOLDCO B.V., STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/13/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant FCA US LLC. (lc)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Resubmitted Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. 1) Resubmitted summons Still MISSING Official case number - Blank. As advised in previous deficiency notice: Case number assigned 5/31/22 to be used henceforth is : 2:22-cv-03684-ODW-JEMx. 2) Filer erroneously attached Civil Cover Sheet to the summons request. This should not be attached to Summons form. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The date and signature line must be left blank. Case number missing or blank. Case number assigned 5/31/22 to be used henceforth is : 2:22-cv-03684-ODW-JEMx (refer to docket no. 3). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak, (Dolin, Tionna)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-33382771 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Leanne Szymczak. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Leanne Szymczak(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leanne Szymczak v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne Szymczak
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?