Vidal Madera et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Vidal Madera and Idali Pagan
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv03770
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Vidal Madera. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Vidal Madera. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Vidal Madera. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Vidal Madera for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Vidal Madera. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Vidal Madera(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for April 26, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on May 14, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (iv)
June 14, 2023 Filing 44 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial & Related Deadlines from March 5, 2024 to June 4, 2024 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for February 16, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on March 5, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. (iv)
April 19, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
April 18, 2023 Filing 41 Second STIPULATION to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines from July 25, 2023 filed by Plaintiff Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan.(Dolin, Tionna)
February 24, 2023 Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Order to Show Cause #36 issued on January 31, 2023 is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2023 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Hailey Rogerson re Order to Show Cause, #36 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
February 7, 2023 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Ariel Harman-Holmes re Order to Show Cause, #36 filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 7, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Companyto Order to Show Cause, #36 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS OR DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than February 7, 2023, the parties shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Courts Order of September 21, 2022. (iv)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES #34 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
January 17, 2023 Filing 34 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines from Currently Set to 120 days later or as ordered by the Court filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Vidal Madera(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Idali Pagan(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2023 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (gga)
September 15, 2022 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 - 7 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan.. (Law, Daniel)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/15/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-ml-02814-AB (PVCx). (et)
July 27, 2022 Filing 28 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s), #21 filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Law, Daniel)
July 25, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation. Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Black Rock Inc. and certain affiliates, The Vanguard Group and cartain affiliates.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 21, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 21, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 20, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Daniel Law re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #14 filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Law, Daniel)
July 20, 2022 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs VIDAL MADERA and IDALI PAGAN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs VIDAL MADERA and IDALI PAGAN. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Vidal Madera(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Idali Pagan(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
July 20, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 20, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Related Case(s): MDL No. 2814-AB (FFMx) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A iso NOT of Related Case, #2 Exhibit B iso NOT of Related Case, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 20, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
July 20, 2022 Filing 19 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 20, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
July 20, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Re: Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before July 20, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See minute order for details. (lom)
June 16, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (iv)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan, (Dolin, Tionna)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33403495 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Vidal Madera, Idali Pagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Vidal Madera(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Idali Pagan(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidal Madera et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vidal Madera
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idali Pagan
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?