Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Marco Arellano
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: Marco Arellano individually doing business as El Criollo Peruvian Cuisine
Case Number: 2:2022cv03776
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 521 Violations of Cable Communications Act of 1984
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Marco Arellano individually doing business as El Criollo Peruvian Cuisine (shb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 14 Amended REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Marco Arellano filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default) (Riley, Thomas)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
July 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Marco Arellano #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The state statute/code under whch the defendant was served with the summons and complaint is not indicated on the proof of service In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Marco Arellano filed by plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default) (Riley, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Marco Arellano served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Josephine Staton, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 21-01, all related Innovative Sports Management, Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 11-cv-7395 TJH (PLAx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (et) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Marco Arellano. (et)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33403875 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc., d/b/a Integrated Sports Media(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Marco Arellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Arellano individually doing business as El Criollo Peruvian Cuisine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?