Elizabeth Thomas v. Lakewood Sheriffs Dept et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thomas
Defendant: Lakewood Sheriffs Dept, Lakewood City Council, 7Eleven, Pioneer Carson Liquor Market, Golden State Water Company, Southern California Edison, Edco Waste Disposal, Lakewood Inn, Carburetor Land, William Rothacker, Jr. and Carson Pioneer Liquor Market
Case Number: 2:2022cv03802
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
2 Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Mail Returned Undeliverable (rts: unable to forward) addressed to Elizabeth Thomas re Chief District Judge Transferring Case, #13 (es)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Mail Returned Undeliverable (rts: unable to forward) addressed to Elizabeth Thomas re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #8 (es)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Mail Returned Undeliverable (rts: unable to forward) addressed to Elizabeth Thomas 11747 Carson Street Lakewood, CA 90715 re Notice of Lodging #11 (es)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Mail Returned (rts: attempted not known unable to forward) addressed to Elizabeth Thomas re Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #12 (es)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas. (es)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, ORDERING no title/unclear submitted by Plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas received on July 7, 2022 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 11-3.1. The document is unintelligible. (Attachments: #1 Attach 1 of 1) (es)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, ORDERING Untitled submitted by Plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas received on 7/7/22 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 11-3.1. The document is unintelligible. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 of 1) (es)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-152) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 2:22-cv-03802-CJC-JEM, Elizabeth Thomas v. Lakewood Sheriffs Dept et al be transferred from the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03802-SPG(JEM). (ap)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Notice of Lodging #11 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. Summons are dated and issued by the Clerk of Court. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING Summons Request filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas re Amended Complaint, #9 (es)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas, (es)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Carburetor Land, Golden State Water Company, Lakewood Inn, Lakewood Sheriffs Dept, Carson Pioneer Liquor Market; Party Lakewood City Council, 7Eleven and Edco Waste Disposal terminated amending Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas(es)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Dkt No. 7) by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time filed on June 24, 2022. Plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to the Order to Show Cause is now due no later than July 25, 2022. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to file a response by the deadline will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a court order. Granting #7 REQUEST for Extension of Time. (es)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas. (es)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than June 23, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim. [See Order for details.] (es)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint - (Referred),, #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.] (san)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas. (jtil)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Thomas against Defendants 7Eleven, Carburetor Land, Edco Waste Disposal, Golden State Water Company, Lakewood City Council, Lakewood Inn, Lakewood Sheriffs Dept, Pioneer Carson Liquor Market, William Rothacker, Jr., Southern California Edison. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing fee $402 Paid). (Attachments: #1 CV71) #2 Summons Request) (jtil). Modified on 6/6/2022 (jtil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth Thomas v. Lakewood Sheriffs Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Sheriffs Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7Eleven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Carson Liquor Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Edison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edco Waste Disposal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carburetor Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Rothacker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Pioneer Liquor Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?