Roberto Castillo v. Costco Wholesale Membership et al
Plaintiff: Roberto Castillo
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Membership, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Does 1 to 25
Case Number: 2:2022cv03980
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett.The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 1:30 PM. Trial set for 7/25/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (iv)
August 1, 2022 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Flock, John)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on the above date in Courtroom 5C of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 11, 2022 Filing 20 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation (Flock, John)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #17 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flock, John)
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request to Substitute #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Proposed orders not lodged with a main document shall be electronically lodged as an attachment to a Notice of Lodging. Proposed Order should contain correct Judge's initials. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-150) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Garnett, Sherilyn Peace, this case is transferred from Judge George H. Wu to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03980-SPG-PLAx. (aco)
June 28, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY John K. Flock in place of attorney Jonathan H. Colman filed by defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Flock, John)
June 20, 2022 Filing 14 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Roberto Castillo.. (Price, Zachary)
June 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roberto Castillo, (Price, Zachary)
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney D. Aaron Brock on behalf of Plaintiff Roberto Castillo. Filed by Plaintiff Roberto Castillo (Attorney Donald James Aaron Brock added to party Roberto Castillo(pty:pla))(Brock, Donald)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 14, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 7, 2022. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (rolm)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Flock, John)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
June 10, 2022 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership, Does 1 to 25 inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Roberto Castillo. Filed in State Court on 6/10/22 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE filed by defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION;. Demand for Jury Trial (Flock, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION;, identifying Costco Wholesale Corporation; Roberto Castillo. (Flock, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION;. (Flock, John)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22STCV16571 Receipt No: ACACDC-33449728 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION;. (Attorney John K Flock added to party COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION;(pty:bkmov))(Flock, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberto Castillo v. Costco Wholesale Membership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Castillo
Represented By: Pejman Rahnama
Represented By: Donald James Aaron Brock
Represented By: Lee A Cirsch
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Membership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Hillel Colman
Represented By: John K Flock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?