AirDoctor, LLC v. Shenzhen Dayou Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: AirDoctor, LLC
Defendant: Shenzhen Jingchuang Trading Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dayou Innovation Technology Co., Ltd., Bingquan He dba shenzhenshifaketikejiyouxiangongsi, Bingquan He doing business as shenzhenshifaketikejiyouxiangongsi and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04000
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-04000-GW(ASx). (aco)
June 16, 2022 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bingquan He. (shb)
June 16, 2022 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Shenzhen Dayou Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.. (shb)
June 16, 2022 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Shenzhen Jingchuang Trading Co., Ltd.. (shb)
June 15, 2022 Filing 17 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 15, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. Related Case(s): Case No. 2:22-cv-04007-MWF-GJS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farnese, Peter)
June 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason M. Drangel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ashly E. Sands. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #6 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The term "et al." cannot be used on the caption of the summons.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC, (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33453406 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party AirDoctor, LLC(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AirDoctor, LLC v. Shenzhen Dayou Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AirDoctor, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Farnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Jingchuang Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Dayou Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingquan He dba shenzhenshifaketikejiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingquan He doing business as shenzhenshifaketikejiyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?