Venice Pride v. PBAK, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation and Venice Pride
Defendant: TBAK, LLC, a limited liability corporation, DOES 1 - 10, PBAK, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04006
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, upon Defendant PBAK, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by David Flyer, Attorney at Law. (Wigley, Benjamin)
June 24, 2022 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #4 , filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rice, Emily)
June 14, 2022 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #4 as to Defendant PBAK, LLC. (car)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
June 14, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #8 . The following error(s) was found: The AO 120 Report should be e-filed under the correct event category. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings and by selecting Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120). The Clerk has re-docketed the AO 120 Report. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 14 CORRECTED Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 CORRECTED NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the name of the Defendant was misspelled and it is now corrected. Forms will be re-issued with the correct name. Docket item #10 and docket item #11 should be disregarded. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 6/14/2022, SEE ITEM 12] Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) Modified on 6/14/2022 (car).
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 6/14/2022, SEE ITEM 12]NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) Modified on 6/14/2022 (car).
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 [Docketed by Clerk] REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING FORM AO-120 filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation. (Wigley, Benjamin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Martin Wigley counsel for Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation. Adding Ernest E. Price as counsel of record for Venice Pride for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride. (Wigley, Benjamin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin Martin Wigley counsel for Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation. Adding E. Lacey Rice as counsel of record for Venice Pride for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride. (Wigley, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #4 filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation. (Wigley, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33454809 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wigley, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation identifying Venice Pride a California nonprofit public benefit corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wigley, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation, identifying PBAK, LLC; Patrick Brunet; Mario Vollera. (Attorney Benjamin Martin Wigley added to party Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation(pty:pla))(Wigley, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation. (Wigley, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venice Pride v. PBAK, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice Pride, a non profit public benefit corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Wigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice Pride
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Represented By: Ernest E Price
Represented By: Benjamin Martin Wigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBAK, LLC, a limited liability corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBAK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?