AirDoctor, LLC v. Durabasics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AirDoctor, LLC
Defendant: Durabasics, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04007
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Durabasics, LLC answer now due 9/1/2022, filed by Defendant Durabasics, LLC.(Attorney Eric J. Goodman added to party Durabasics, LLC(pty:dft))(Goodman, Eric)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC, upon Defendant Durabasics, LLC served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City Mill Company, Limited, Registered Agent, by serving Rhoda Kihikihi - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Farnese, Peter)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-04000-GW (ASx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-04007-GW (ASx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu. (aco)
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ashly E. Sands. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason M. Drangel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Durabasics, LLC. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (sh)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC, (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33454435 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff AirDoctor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party AirDoctor, LLC(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AirDoctor, LLC v. Durabasics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AirDoctor, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Farnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durabasics, LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?