Charles Miller v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Miller
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv04012
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
2 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT JOINT ADR STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-123) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-04012 KK(JPRx). (rn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Charles Miller. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Charles Miller for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Charles Miller(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 10, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Charles Miller. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 24, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mani Arabi counsel for Plaintiff Charles Miller. Filed by plaintiff Charles Miller. (Attorney Mani Arabi added to party Charles Miller(pty:pla))(Arabi, Mani)
July 12, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon counsel for Plaintiff Charles Miller. Filed by plaintiff Charles Miller. (Attorney Joy Moiselle De Leon added to party Charles Miller(pty:pla))(De Leon, Joy)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #24 , the Court modifies its Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk)
June 7, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Dates and Related Dates filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Laroque in Support of Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Charles Miller(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. Counsel are directed to contact the private mediator of their choice to arrange a date and time for the mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8-15-23. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven (7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. Joint status report re settlement due by: 8-22-23. (lom)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 10/10/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates - Jury Trial) (lom)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on August 26, 2022. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 12, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 11, 2022 Filing 18 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
July 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
July 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 7, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 7, 2022 Filing 12 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 7, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
June 20, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Charles Miller, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc., Registered Agent, authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (jtil)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller, (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33454917 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Charles Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Charles Miller(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Miller v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Miller
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Joy Moiselle De Leon
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?