Vua Kho Bo, Inc. et al v. Silver Horn Jerky Inc. et al
Defendant: Silver Horn Jerky Inc., Qua Dinh, Thanh Huong Hoang and Minh Hoang
Counter Defendant: Vua Kho Bo, Inc. and Wendy Yueh Chi Lin
Case Number: 2:2022cv04049
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2022, at 9:00 AM. (jre)
August 5, 2022 Filing 25 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendants All Plaintiffs ; Jury Demand, filed by Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff Minh Hoang, Qua Dinh, Silver Horn Jerky Inc., Thanh Huong Hoang.(Grant, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Silver Horn Jerky, INC., Qua Dinh, Thanh Huong Hoang, and Minh Hoang. (Grant, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Qua Dinh, Minh Hoang, Thanh Huong Hoang, Silver Horn Jerky Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey H. Grant added to party Qua Dinh(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey H. Grant added to party Minh Hoang(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey H. Grant added to party Thanh Huong Hoang(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey H. Grant added to party Silver Horn Jerky Inc.(pty:dft))(Grant, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER #21 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the Default #20 entered by the Court on 7/25/2022 in this matter be set aside. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until 8/5/2022 to file their responsive pleadings in response to the Complaint. (jp)
July 26, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Defendants Silver Horn Jerky Inc. and Minh Hoang filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, Vua Kho Bo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Songfong)
July 25, 2022 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendants Silver Horn Jerky Inc., Minh Hoang. (jp)
July 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Qua Dinh, Hanh Huong Hoang #18 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: (1) Incorrect statute prompt of FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) selected...service was NOT made on the Clerks Office of USDC. (2) Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (jp)
July 21, 2022 Filing 18 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants All Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Vua Kho Bo, Inc., Wendy Yueh Chi Lin. (Wang, Songfong)
July 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #15 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect statute prompt of FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) selected...service was NOT made on the Clerks Office of USDC. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
July 11, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, upon Defendant Qua Dinh served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Wang, Songfong)
July 11, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, upon Defendant Thanh Huong Hoang served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Wang, Songfong)
July 11, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vua Kho Bo, Inc., Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, upon Defendant Minh Hoang served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thanh Hoang: Wife in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wang, Songfong)
July 11, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Vua Kho Bo, Inc., Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, upon Defendant Silver Horn Jerky Inc. served on 6/17/2022, answer due 7/8/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thanh Hoang in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wang, Songfong)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Qua Dinh, Minh Hoang, Thanh Huong Hoang, Silver Horn Jerky Inc. (jp)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, Vua Kho Bo, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, Vua Kho Bo, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, Vua Kho Bo, Inc., (Wang, Songfong)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, Vua Kho Bo, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Wendy Yueh Chi Lin, Vua Kho Bo, Inc.. (Wang, Songfong)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33462128 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Vua Kho Bo, Inc., Wendy Yueh Chi Lin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Attorney Songfong Tommy Wang added to party Wendy Yueh Chi Lin(pty:pla), Attorney Songfong Tommy Wang added to party Vua Kho Bo, Inc.(pty:pla))(Wang, Songfong)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vua Kho Bo, Inc. et al v. Silver Horn Jerky Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vua Kho Bo, Inc.
Represented By: Songfong Tommy Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wendy Yueh Chi Lin
Represented By: Songfong Tommy Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Horn Jerky Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Grant
Represented By: James E. Doroshow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qua Dinh
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Grant
Represented By: James E. Doroshow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thanh Huong Hoang
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Grant
Represented By: James E. Doroshow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minh Hoang
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Grant
Represented By: James E. Doroshow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?