G and L 436 Bedford, LLC v. Christopher Vonschlobohm et al
Plaintiff: G and L 436 Bedford, LLC
Defendant: Christopher Vonschlobohm, Susan Evans, Chris Vonschlobohm, Christoper Von Schlobohm, Chris Von Schlobohm, Susan Spell, Susan Evans-Spell, Susan Spell-Evans, Susan C. Spell, S. Cheryl Spell, Susan S. Schlobohm, Susan Vonschlobohm, Susan S.E. Vonschlobohm, Susan S. Vonschlobohm, Susan Cheryl Spell Evans, Susan C. Spell Evans, Winston Spell, Winchrist Prime, LLC and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2022cv04174
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Filing 20 Mail Returned addressed to Winston Spell re Order #10 . (iv)
July 20, 2022 Filing 19 Opposition In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #15 filed by Plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael I. Weiss in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to the Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendants regarding personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to the Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendants regarding personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim, #3 Supplement Proof of service)(Lerner, Leonard)
July 20, 2022 Filing 18 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court, West District, Santa Monica. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, West District, Santa Monica. (twdb)
July 20, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Accordingly, this action is REMANDED to Los Angeles Superior Court. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (twdb)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: denying #13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. (lom)
July 13, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE #15 filed by Defendants Susan Evans, Christopher VonSchlobohm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibits 2 and 3, #4 Proof of Service)(lom)
July 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION RE: LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS; AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF MAY BE GRANTED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SUSAN EV ANS, M.D. filed by Defendants Susan Evans, Christopher VonSchlobohm. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D - Part 1, #3 Exhibit D - Part 2, #4 Exhibit E and F, #5 Proof of Service) (lom)
July 13, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Defendants Susan Evans, Christopher VonSchlobohm. (lom)
July 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff G and L 436 Bedford, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of motion to remand, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proof of service) (Attorney Leonard D Lerner added to party G and L 436 Bedford, LLC(pty:pla)) (Lerner, Leonard)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Removing Defendants are ORDERED to file with the Court acopy of the Complaint filed in Superior Court no later than July 8, 2022. By that same date, Removing Defendants must also obtain the consent of Winchrist Prime, LLC, to the removal of this action to federal court. Winchrist Prime, LLC, may not appear in this action without an attorney. If the Complaint is not filed or the consent of Winchrist Prime, LLC, is not filed by a lawyer by that date, then this action will be remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by defendants Susan Evans, Winston Spell, Christopher Vonschlobohm. (ghap)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Susan Evans, Winston Spell, Christopher Vonschlobohm. (ghap)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles, case number 22SMCV00672 with NO copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Pedro V Castillo. Filing fee $402:PAID, filed by defendants Christopher Vonschlobohm, Susan Evans, Winston Spell. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G and L 436 Bedford, LLC v. Christopher Vonschlobohm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christoper Von Schlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Von Schlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Evans-Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Spell-Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cheryl Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Schlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S.E. Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Vonschlobohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cheryl Spell Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Spell Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchrist Prime, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G and L 436 Bedford, LLC
Represented By: Michael Ira Weiss
Represented By: Leonard D Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?