Gail Shareef Golden v. Delta Airlines Alliang Global Corporate
Plaintiff: Gail Shareef Golden
Defendant: Delta Airlines Alliang Global Corporate
Case Number: 2:2022cv04653
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Mark C Scarsi
3 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (yl)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2;20-cv-00786 JAK(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-04653 JAK(SKx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Although Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, i.e., without legal representation, she/he nonetheless is required to comply with Court orders, the Local Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 83-2.2.3. The Local Rules are available on the Court's website, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/court-procedures/ local-rules. The Court cannot provide legal advice to any party, including pro se litigants, i.e., parties who are not represented by a lawyer. There is a free "Pro Se Clinic" that can provide information and guidance about many aspects of civil litigation in this Court. The Court notes that a party to this lawsuit does not have a lawyer. Parties in court without a lawyer are called "pro se litigants." These parties often face special challenges in federal court. Public Counsel runs a free Federal Pro Se Clinic where pro se litigants can get information and guidance. The Clinic is located at the Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 (note that the clinic may not be open for in-person appointments during the pandemic). Pro se litigants must call or submit an on-line application to request services as follows: on-line applications can be submitted at http://prose.cacd.uscourts.gov/los-angeles, or call (213) 385-2977, ext. 270. Pro se litigants may submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. Only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Documents are submitted in PDF format through an online portal on the Court's website. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. Attorneys are required by the local rules to file documents electronically using the Court's CM/ECF System. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Gail Shareef Golden. (et)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gail Shareef Golden, identifying Other Affiliate Idabell Cox for Gail Shareef Golden. (et)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Delta Airlines Alliang Global Corporate. Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish., filed by Plaintiff Gail Shareef Golden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gail Shareef Golden v. Delta Airlines Alliang Global Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Shareef Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines Alliang Global Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?