Junior Sports Magazines Inc. et al v. Rob Bonta et al
Plaintiff: Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Raymond Brown, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, The CRPA Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Inc. and Second Amendment Foundation
Defendant: Rob Bonta and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv04663
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re: Minutes #24 . The 9/12/2022 Status Conference at 11:00 AM will be held by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2022 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Barvir, Anna)
August 19, 2022 Filing 25 FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION Granting #23 re: Order #24 . (iv)
August 19, 2022 Filing 24 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #12 ; PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OR SUR-REPLY BRIEF #23 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court hereby sets a status conference for September 12, 2022 at 11:00 AM, for the purpose of discussing a new hearing date for plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Additionally, plaintiffs are granted leave to file the supplemental brief, dkt 23. (iv)
August 18, 2022 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Supplemental or Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barvir, Anna)
August 18, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Errata re: Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Barvir, Anna)
August 15, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Barvir, Anna)
August 8, 2022 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Kevin J. Kelly in support of Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 filed by Defendant Rob Bonta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kelly, Kevin)
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 filed by Defendant Rob Bonta. (Kelly, Kevin)
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) AND SETTING HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The 8/22/2022 hearing on the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 at 10:00 AM will be held by Zoom before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Zoom Webinar Information can be found on the Court's website, under Judge Snyder's Procedures.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation #16 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Rob Bonta to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 30 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' pending motion for a preliminary injunction. (gk)
July 28, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 30 days after Court's ruling on motion for preliminary injunction re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendant Rob Bonta Rob Bonta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kevin)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Application #13 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all papers in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction must be filed and served by 8/8/2022. Any reply must be filed and served by 8/15/2022. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #12 shall take place on 8/22/2022 at 10:00 AM. (gk)
July 21, 2022 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 to August 8, 2022 #13 filed by Defendant Rob Bonta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kevin)
July 20, 2022 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 #12 to August 8, 2022 filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Anna M. Barvir, #3 Proposed Order) (Barvir, Anna)
July 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Enjoining Defendant from enforcing Bus. & Prof. Code Sec. 22949.80 filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Anna M. Barvir, #4 Declaration of Jonathan L. Coleman, #5 Declaration of Andy Fink, #6 Exhibit 17 to 20 for Declaration of Andy Fink, #7 Declaration of Steve Gomez, #8 Declaration of Alan Gottlieb, #9 Declaration of Richard Minnich, #10 Declaration of Allison Rangel, #11 Declaration of Sam Paredes, #12 Declaration of Anna Canon, #13 Declaration of Jay Fitzgerald, #14 Proposed Order) (Barvir, Anna)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The CRPA Foundation, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Raymond Brown, Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, upon Defendant Rob Bonta served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Silkwood, Person Authorized to Accept Service on behalf of Rob Bonta, Attorney General for the State of California in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Barvir, Anna)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin James Kelly on behalf of Defendant Rob Bonta (Attorney Kevin James Kelly added to party Rob Bonta(pty:dft))(Kelly, Kevin)
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rob Bonta. (et)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation, (Barvir, Anna)
July 8, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Barvir, Anna)
July 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Brown, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., The CRPA Foundation. (Barvir, Anna)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 07/08/2022, receipt number ACACDC-33596259), filed by Plaintiffs The CRPA Foundation, California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Raymond Brown, Junior Sports Magazines Inc., Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc., California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Raymond Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Gun Owners of California, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Junior Sports Magazines Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party The CRPA Foundation(pty:pla))(Barvir, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Junior Sports Magazines Inc. et al v. Rob Bonta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Sports Magazines Inc.
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Brown
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Youth Shooting Sports Association, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redlands California Youth Clay Shooting Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The CRPA Foundation
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of California, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Represented By: Tiffany Dawn Cheuvront
Represented By: Anna M Barvir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Donald E J Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Represented By: Kevin James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?