Frank Davis, Jr. v. Arc Point Labs West Los Angeles
Plaintiff: Frank Davis, Jr.
Defendant: Arc Point Labs West Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2022cv04899
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, RE: #3 . Plaintiff shall file the information requested in the Courts July 26, 2022 order (Dkt. #7 ) by October 18, 2022. Failure to file the additional requested information by that date will result in dismissal. (twdb)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Cormac J. Carney, ORDERING Letter to the Judge submitted by Plaintiff Frank Davis, Jr received on 08/23/22 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 83-2.5 No letters to the judge. (rolm)
August 22, 2022 Filing 11 Mail Returned addressed to Frank Davis Jr. re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 (rolm)
August 22, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Frank Davis Jr. re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 (rolm)
August 22, 2022 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Frank Davis Jr. re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 (rolm)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, On REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Prisoner Case) #3 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the filer must do the following: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Frank Davis, Jr. (lh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frank Davis, Jr, (lh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Arc Point Labs West Los Angeles. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Frank Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Davis, Jr. v. Arc Point Labs West Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arc Point Labs West Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?