Alexander Stross v. Sourav Khatua et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: Sourav Khatua a resident of the Republic of India doing business as Gungun Music, Chen Shuling a resident of the Hong Kong Special Administrative Region of the Peoples Republic of China doing business as Life Victory Group, Does 1 through 10, Shinelook Media India Pvt Ltd. doing business as Next9News and Sinto Joseph
Case Number: 2:2022cv05168
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:22-cv-04426 RSWL(KSx) (rn)
August 31, 2022 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 as to Defendant Sinto Joseph, Sourav Khatua, Shinelook Media India Pvt Ltd., Chen Shuling. (iv)
August 30, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #13 filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen)
August 30, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Sourav Khatua, Chen Shuling, Shinelook Media India Pvt Ltd., Sinto Joseph amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doniger, Stephen)
August 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-04426 (Doniger, Stephen)
August 8, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Stephen M. Doniger re (Lead Trial Counsel) filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
July 26, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Does, Sourav Khatua, Chen Shuling. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alexander Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doniger, Stephen)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross, (Doniger, Stephen)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33698228 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint) (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Alexander Stross(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Stross v. Sourav Khatua et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Represented By: Benjamin Firestone Tookey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sourav Khatua a resident of the Republic of India doing business as Gungun Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Shuling a resident of the Hong Kong Special Administrative Region of the Peoples Republic of China doing business as Life Victory Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinelook Media India Pvt Ltd. doing business as Next9News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinto Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?