Latanya Williams v. Amar Square LLC et al
Plaintiff: Latanya Williams
Defendant: Amar Square LLC and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2022cv05206
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 16 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Amar Square, LLC. (iv)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv)
September 22, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default Amar Square LLC Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason)
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams, upon Defendant Amar Square LLC served on 8/25/2022, answer due 9/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lili Kao, As Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jason)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williamsto Order to Show Cause, #10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases filed by the So. Cal. Firm (iv)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before AUGUST 12, 2022. (iv)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amar Square LLC. (et)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Latanya Williams. (Kim, Jason)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33711131 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Latanya Williams(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latanya Williams v. Amar Square LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Williams
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amar Square LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?